This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:22:00 (UTC).

FELIX G. RIMANDO, JR AND MARCELA N. RIMANDO

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 FELIX G RIMANDO, JR AND MARCELA N RIMANDO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8178

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RIMANDO, FELIX G., JR

Respondent

RIMANDO, MARCELA N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: RIMANDO MARCELA N.; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: RIMANDO, FELIX G., JR; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED FROM 32 TO 23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment MSE: MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 04/09/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Comment JNM: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED; MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 04/09/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Stipulation filed. Additional Info: Comment STI: (S) STIPULATION & WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment DRSDD: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PETITIONER'S PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY FELIX G. RIMANDO JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment DRSDD: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MARCELA N. RIMANDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Comment DDUJ: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment JR: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JFDE: JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DOCUMENT EXAMINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Case assigned to Department for all purposes. Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 32 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Income & Expense Declaration. Additional Info: Comment IE: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY FELIX G. RIMANDO JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY FELIX G. RIMANDO JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0566-CK 184/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for RIMANDO, FELIX G., JR : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260566 RIMANDO, FELIX G., JR $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for RIMANDO, FELIX G., JR : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: RIMANDO, FELIX G., JR; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less