This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 05:59:32 (UTC).

FELIPE A. PRIAST vs. GENENTECH, INC

Case Summary

On 08/26/2016 FELIPE A PRIAST filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GENENTECH, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L., Karesh, Jonathan E., DuBois, Richard H. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1095

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

DuBois, Richard H.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIAST, FELIPE A.

Defendant

GENENTECH, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, RICHARD

Defendant Attorneys

Giese, Allison R.

PAVLIDAKIS, ALEXANDRA

HERMLE, LYNNE C.

 

Court Documents

Clerk's certificate.

Clerk's certificate Re: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal Omitted Documents on Appeal A153574 Comment Re: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal, Omitted Documents on Appeal A153574

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; AND DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA PAVLIDAKIS IN SUPPORT Comment MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; AND DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA PAVLIDAKIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GENENTECH INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO MOTION TO SEAL Comment TO MOTION TO SEAL

Opposition.

Opposition PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SU Comment PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED FACTS

Proof of Service by.

Proof of Service by FEDERAL EXPRESS with a service date of 08/10/17 Comment FEDERAL EXPRESS with a service date of 08/10/17

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts.

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. Comment IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC.

Declaration.

Declaration OF RAMESH DHANAPAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. Comment OF RAMESH DHANAPAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO Comment OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ETC.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Clerk's Certificate Re:Default.

Clerk's Certificate Re:Default A153574 Comment A153574

Fee Waiver Granted.

Fee Waiver Granted on appeal Comment on appeal

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support Comment OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (REDACTED)

Motion.

Motion TO SEAL EXHIBITS AND TESTIMONY ETC. Comment TO SEAL EXHIBITS AND TESTIMONY, ETC.

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts.

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts IN SUPPORT OF GENENTECH'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN Comment IN SUPPORT OF GENENTECH'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Motion to Compel Further Responses.

Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents NO. 41 Set Three Comment to Request for Production of Documents NO. 41, Set Three

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT SIGNED BY LINDSEY BARNHART Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, SIGNED BY LINDSEY BARNHART

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Notice of Case Management Conference 1/20/17 Comment Notice of Case Management Conference 1/20/17

Complaint.

Complaint

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; DuBois Richard H.; Judgment Type; Judgment/order; Judgment - Monetary and Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To: GENENTECH, INC; Awarded Against: PRIAST, FELIPE A.; Comment: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL TAKE NOTHING BY HIS COMPLAINT AGAINST GENENTECH, AND THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED FOR DEFENDANT GENENTECH, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO GENENTECH TO RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF ITS COSTS OF SUIT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1700 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT AND CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1033.5 AND SUCH RELIEF AS THE COURT MAY DEEM PROPER. (SIGNED BY JUDGE RICHARD H.. DUBOIS ON 120417).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Transmittal of Record on Appeal. Additional Info: Transmittal of Record on Appeal Omitted Documents on Appeal A153571 Comment Omitted Documents on Appeal A153571

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's certificate. Additional Info: Clerk's certificate Re: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal Omitted Documents on Appeal A153574 Comment Re: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal, Omitted Documents on Appeal A153574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Transmittal of Record on Appeal. Additional Info: Transmittal of Record on Appeal A153574 Comment A153574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice Cost of preparing Reporter's Transcript and Clerk's Transcript (Respondent) on appeal A153374 Comment Cost of preparing Reporter's Transcript and Clerk's Transcript (Respondent) on appeal A153374

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Notice of Designation. Additional Info: Appellant's Notice of Designation AMENDED - A153374 Comment AMENDED - A153374

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Respondent's Notice of Designation. Additional Info: Respondent's Notice of Designation A153574 Comment A153574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate RE: Dismiss Appellant's Default. Additional Info: Clerk's Certificate RE: Dismiss Appellant's Default A153574 Comment A153574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Notice of Designation. Additional Info: Appellant's Notice of Designation A153574 Comment A153574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate Re:Default. Additional Info: Clerk's Certificate Re:Default A153574 Comment A153574

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-013906-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-013820-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-068971-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-039322-HOJ PRIAST, FELIPE A. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Financial info for PRIAST, FELIPE A. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Financial: PRIAST, FELIPE A.; Total Financial Assessment $885.00; Total Payments and Credits $885.00

    Read MoreRead Less