This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 21:08:13 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE VS EMILY PINEDA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2012 FARMERS INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EMILY PINEDA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Foiles, Robert D, STEVEN L. DYLINA and ROBERT D. FOILES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6784

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Foiles, Robert D

STEVEN L. DYLINA

ROBERT D. FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

PINEDA, EMILY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRUMWASSER, GREGG

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT, STEVEN R

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Document.

FILING (3) Comment FILED: CLERK'S NOTICE OF PRE-ARBITRATION AND SETTING HEARING FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE SERVED ON EMILY PINEDA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/21/13.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE (4) Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE FILED BY EMILY PINEDA REPRESENTED BY STEVEN R SCOTT - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (IMPROPER FORM SUBMITTED) FILED.

Motion.

NOTICE (2) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EMILY PINEDA. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EMILY PINEDA.

Document.

NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, FILED.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Document.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF PRE-ARBITRATION AND SETTING HEARING FILED. Comment FILED: CLERK'S NOTICE OF PRE-ARBITRATION AND SETTING HEARING, FILED.

Conversion Action.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. TIME ESTIMATE: 16:0 Comment AIMCT1: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. TIME ESTIMATE: 16:00 HOUR(S)

Document.

AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (IMPROPER FORM SUBMITTED) FILED. Comment FILED: AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (IMPROPER FORM SUBMITTED), FILED.

Motion.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY FARME Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Motion.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EX Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; PINEDA, EMILY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY A ORTEGA ON 03/17/16.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment CFO: THE COURT FINDS/ORDERS: CASE IS NOW DISMISSED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment FFT: TODAY'S DATE WAS WAIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment FFT: THE COURT NOTES THAT AN APPEARANCE WAS MADE ON 01/26/16 BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment COM: MS. SCHULMAN IS UNAWARE OF THE STATUS OF THE CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment COM: THE COURT INQUIRES WHETHER THE CLAIM HAS BEEN PAID.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment COM1: (CASE CALLED AT 9:12 AM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Limited up to $10000).; Additional Info: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE FILED BY EMILY PINEDA REPRESENTED BY STEVEN Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE FILED BY EMILY PINEDA, REPRESENTED BY STEVEN R SCOTT - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Case Payment Receipt # 201209210528 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Total Financial Assessment $405.00; Total Payments and Credits $405.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/19/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120921-0528-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

2. That at all times herein mentioned plaintiff was, and now is FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Interinsurance Exchange, its subsidiaries, affiliates, and/or parent companies, duly organized and existing under and by virtue of the laws of the State of California, and authorized to do business in the State of California, as an insurer.

3. That at all times herein mentioned, at least one of the defendants herein was a resident of the City of Menlo Park, Southern Branch: Hall of Justice and Records, County of

San Mateo, State of California.

4, That all times herein mentioned Illya Bershteyn was the owner of a certain 2001 Honda. 5. That prior to the commencement of this action, and more barticularly on the

‘date of the accident hereinafter alleged, plaintiff insured Illya Bershteyn by a policy of insurance for collision damage to said aforedescribed motor vehicle and loss of use of said motor vehicle; that plaintiff paid $7,371.31 on account of and for collision damage to said aforedescribed motor vehicle, for collision damage occurring at the time and place of the accident hereinafter alleged, and as consideration for such payment, the claims and demands against any person, persons or property; that to the extent of said sum paid by plaintiff, plaintiff has been assigned or is subrogated in the place of and to the demands of its said policyholder, for said policyholder’s motor vehicle damage as hereinafter described.

6. That at all times herein fientioned defendants, Emily Pineda; DOE 1 through DOE 35, and each of them, possessed or were the owners of a certain motor vehicle, and at the time and place of the accident hereinafter alleged, said motor vehicle was being driven and

operated by defendants, Emily Pineda, DOE 6 through DOE 10, and each of them, with the

consent, permission and knowledge of defendants, Emily Pineda, DOE 1 through DOE 5, and each of them.

7. Plaintiff is informed and believes, and upon such information and belief alleges, that at all times herein mentioned defendants, Emily Pineda, DOE 6 through DOE 10, and each of them, were agents, servants, employers and/or employees of defendants, Emily Pineda, DOE 11 through DOE 15, and each of them, and were at all such times acting within the purpose and scope of said agency, service and/or employment.

8. That at all times herein mentioned defendants, DOE 16 through DOE 20, and each of them, possessed or were the owners of a certain motor vehicle, and at the time and place of the accident herein-after alleged, said motor vehicle was being driven and operated by defendants DOE 21 through DOE 25, and each of them, with thg consent, permission and knowledge of defendants DOE 16 through DOE 20, and each of them.

9. Plaintiff is informed and believes, and upon sfich information and belief alleges, that at all times herein mentioned defendants DOE 21 through DOE 25, and each of them, were agents, servants, employers and/or employees of defendants DOE 16 through DOE 20, and defendants DOE 26 through DOE 30, and each of them, and were at all such times acting within the purpose and scope of said agency, service and/or employment.

10. That on or about 04/17/2012, said insured motor vehicle was along and upon Alameda De Las Pulgas, at or near its intersection with Maddux Drive, both of which are public streets and highways in the City of Redwood City, Southern Branch: Hall of Justice and Records, County of San Mateo, State of California.

11. That at said time and place the defendants, and each of them, so negligently,

carelessly and unlawfully drove, entrusted, controlled, maintained, operated and repaired

their said motor vehicle, so as to cause collision damage to plaintiff’s policyholder’s said motor vehicle, and loss of use of said motor vehicle, thereby damaging plaintiff and/or plaintiff’s insured, who assigned their claim to plaintiff, in the sum of $7,371.31. WHEREFORE, plaintiff prays for judgment against the defendants and each of them, as follows: 1. For damages in the sum of $7,371.31;

2. For prejudgment interest as allowed by law from 04/23/2012;

3. For costs of suit incurred herein; and 4. For such other relief as this Court may deem proper and just. 5. Plaintiff remits any sum in excess of the jurisdiction of this Court. DATED: 09/10/2012 DOWNS & ASSOCIAT By: GREGG STRUMWASSER, Esq. Attorney for Plaintiff

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, STEVEN R