This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 07:37:49 (UTC).

FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs. HIGH QUALITY CUSTOM CABINETRY, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HIGH QUALITY CUSTOM CABINETRY, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5041

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

HIGH QUALITY CUSTOM CABINETRY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CU, JOHN T.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CASE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT- SERVING - NOE ERAZO- OWNER

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice AS TO CAUSES OF ACTION FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND QUANTUM MER Comment Without Prejudice AS TO CAUSES OF ACTION FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND QUANTUM MERUIT ONLY

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CASE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT- SERVING - NOE ERAZO- OWNER

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice AS TO CAUSES OF ACTION FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND QUANTUM MER Comment Without Prejudice AS TO CAUSES OF ACTION FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND QUANTUM MERUIT ONLY

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED 11/20/19 Comment PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED 11/20/19

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice COMPLAINT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; HIGH QUALITY CUSTOM CABINETRY, INC.; Comment: PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 8/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED 11/20/19 Comment PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED 11/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment: (DISMISSAL AS TO CAUSES OF ACTION FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND QUANTUM MERUIT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice AS TO CAUSES OF ACTION FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND QUANTUM MER Comment Without Prejudice AS TO CAUSES OF ACTION FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND QUANTUM MERUIT ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CASE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT- SERVING - NOE ERAZO- OWNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-053926-HOJ NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY SPECIALTY INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CU JOHN T.