This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 23:38:44 (UTC).

EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC. vs. BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5806

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC.

Defendants

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

DOES 1 - 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKEEN, MARK E.

Defendant Attorney

HACK, MARION T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL) AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL) AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-052767-HOJ BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC. $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL) AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL) AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-044909-HOJ EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC. FKA VALLEYCREST LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marion Teresa Hack