Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 04:18:10 (UTC).

ESTHER EAMES,LLC vs BERBAE TORRES,et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2012 ESTHER EAMES,LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BERBAE TORRES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borja, Hugo R and Borja, Hugo R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6595

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borja, Hugo R

Borja, Hugo R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTHER EAMES LLC

Defendants

GONZALEZ, JOSE FUENTES

ALL OCCUPANTS

DOE, JOSE

TORRES, BERBAE

ARTEGA, MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED

Stipulation & Order.

STIPULATION Comment SO: STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER JUDGEMENT/DISMISSAL FILED BY ESTHER EAMES LLC.

At-Issue Memorandum.

FILING (3) Comment AIM: AT-ISSUE MEMO REQUESTING ESTHER EAMES LLC FILED BY PLAINTIFF. TIME ESTIMATE: 3. DAY(S)

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC AS TO BERBAE TORRES MIGUEL ARTEGA.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (4) Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC AS TO JOSE DOE BY SUB-SERVING MARIA HERNANDEZ. MAILING DATE OF 09/19/12.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (3) Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC AS TO BERBAE TORRES BY SUB-SERVING MARIA HERNANDEZ. MAILING DATE OF 09/19/12.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC AS TO MIGUEL ARTEGA BY SUB-SERVING MARIA HERNANDEZ. MAILING DATE OF 09/19/12.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSUO: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 FILED. TYPE OF SERVICE: SUBSTITUTED DATE: 09/19/12

Amendment filed. Naming Doe/Roe.

COMPLAINT (2) Comment ATCND: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC FILED; NAMING DOE/ROE 1 AS JOSE FUENTES GONZALEZ

Fee Waiver Granted on Additional Court Fees.

ORDER - FEE WAIVER (2) Comment OWFGS: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOSE FUENTES GONZALEZ GRANTED FOR JURY FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 SIGNED BY BY RULE OF LAW ON 09/24/12.

Fee Waiver Granted.

ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY JOSE FUENTES GONZALEZ GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $225.00 SIGNED BY BY RULE OF LAW ON 09/24/12.

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER Comment ANS3: (L-UD) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC FILED BY JOSE FUENTES GONZALEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

Conversion Action.

FILING Comment PJF: PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC BY JOSE FUENTES GONZALEZ. COPY OF CLAIM MAILED TO PLAINTIFF(S).

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: ALL OCCUPANTS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); Party; Name: GONZALEZ JOSE FUENTES; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); Party; Name: GONZALEZ, JOSE FUENTES; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); Party; Name: DOE, JOSE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: ESTHER EAMES LLC; Awarded Against: TORRES BERBAE; ARTEGA, MIGUEL; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 11/14/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC FOR ESTHER EAMES LLC JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC AGAINST BERBAE TORRES, MIGUEL ARTEGA JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 526 LAUREL STREET REDWOOD CITY CA. 94063.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121120-0764-CK 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment EXFEE: EX-PARTE FEE PAID BY ESTHER EAMES LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121114-0521-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment WPRP1: (L) WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFPP: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 526 LAUREL STREET REDWOOD CITY CA. 94063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC AGAINST BERBAE TORRES MIGUEL ARTEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF ESTHER EAMES LLC FOR ESTHER EAMES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2012
  • Case Sealed by Order. Additional Info: Comment SEALUD: UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SEALED PER CCP 1161.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment TUDM: (L) TRACK ASSIGNMENT: UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DRAD1: DAILY RENTAL VALUE $83.33; ADDRESS 526 LAUREL STREET REDWOOD CITY CA. 94063; 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 526 LAUREL STREET REDWOOD CITY CA94063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • Financial info for ESTHER EAMES LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201211200764 ESTHER EAMES LLC $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • Financial info for ESTHER EAMES LLC : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Financial info for ESTHER EAMES LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201209170222 ESTHER EAMES LLC $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Financial info for ESTHER EAMES LLC : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Financial: ESTHER EAMES LLC; Total Financial Assessment $300.00; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESTHER EAMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ