This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 18:12:33 (UTC).

ESTER ADUT VS KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE

Case Summary

On 12/10/2012 ESTER ADUT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8406

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADUT, ESTER

Defendant

BURNSIDE, KIRBY JUNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SCHNECK, MARGARET M

P.O. Box 1701

San Jose, CA 95109

 

Court Documents

Opposition.

OPPOSITION (2) Comment OPP: OPPOSITION TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S REPLY TO PLNTFF.'S OPP. TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S MOT.& DEC. OF ESTER ADUT FILED BY ESTER ADUT

Conversion Action.

COMPLAINT (2) Comment ACS: (U) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ADUT FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: OBJECTION TO DEC. BY J. VU FILED IN SUPP. OF DEF. MOTION; MOT. TO STRIKE; REQ. FOR RULING ON OBJECT FILED.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE ETC. SERVED ON ESTER ADUT WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 03/08/13 FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF KIRBY J. BURNSIDE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Motion.

NOTICE Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16 FILED BY KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FILED. DATE OF MAIL Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/11/13.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OBJECTION TO DECL BY JENNIFER VU; ETC SERVED ON KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FIL Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OBJECTION TO DECL BY JENNIFER VU; ETC SERVED ON KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/10/13.

Document.

OBJECTION TO DEC. BY J. VU FILED IN SUPP. OF DEF. MOTION; MOT. TO STRIKE; REQ. FOR RULING ON OBJECT Comment FILED: OBJECTION TO DEC. BY J. VU FILED IN SUPP. OF DEF. MOTION; MOT. TO STRIKE; REQ. FOR RULING ON OBJECT FILED.

Opposition.

OPPOSITION TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S REPLY TO PLNTFF.'S OPP. TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S MOT.& DEC. OF ESTER ADUT F Comment OPP: OPPOSITION TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S REPLY TO PLNTFF.'S OPP. TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S MOT.& DEC. OF ESTER ADUT FILED BY ESTER ADUT

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER T. VU IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF JENNIFER T. VU IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Conversion Action.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE Comment REP: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE

Opposition.

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY ESTER ADUT Comment OPP: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY ESTER ADUT

Document.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY MARGARET M SCHNECK FOR DEFENDANT KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FILED. Comment FILED: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY MARGARET M SCHNECK FOR DEFENDANT KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE, FILED.

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FILED. DATE OF MAIL Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/11/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OBJECTION TO DECL BY JENNIFER VU; ETC SERVED ON KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FIL Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF OBJECTION TO DECL BY JENNIFER VU; ETC SERVED ON KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/10/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: MOOT. ACTION DISMISSED 6/11/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment HEARING: MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16 BY KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketMotion hearings.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: LM HEARING: MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16 BY KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; BURNSIDE, KIRBY JUNE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; ADUT, ESTER; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: OBJECTION TO DEC. BY J. VU FILED IN SUPP. OF DEF. MOTION; MOT. TO STRIKE; REQ. FOR RULING ON OBJECT Comment FILED: OBJECTION TO DEC. BY J. VU FILED IN SUPP. OF DEF. MOTION; MOT. TO STRIKE; REQ. FOR RULING ON OBJECT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition.; Additional Info: OPPOSITION TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S REPLY TO PLNTFF.'S OPP. TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S MOT.& DEC. OF ESTER ADUT F Comment OPP: OPPOSITION TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S REPLY TO PLNTFF.'S OPP. TO DEF. BURNSIDE'S MOT.& DEC. OF ESTER ADUT FILED BY ESTER ADUT

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2013
  • DocketFirst Paper Fee Paid.; Additional Info: Comment FFP: FIRST PAPER FEE PAID BY KIRBY JUNE BURNSIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/10/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver Granted.; Additional Info: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY ESTER ADUT GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 SIGNED Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY ESTER ADUT GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00, SIGNED BY CLERK ON 12/10/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ESTER ADUT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: DEFENDANT APPEARED AT COUNTER TO ADDRESS MATTER. DOCUMENT NOT REJECTED..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: (U) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ADUT FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT) Comment ACS: (U) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ADUT FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI1-001

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATI‘TNEY (Name, Slate Bar numper, and address): FOR COURT USE ONLY

[] ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [ ] does not exceed $10,000 [_1 exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 [2X] ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) [] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint L1 from limited to unlimited [ ] from unlimited to limited

1 Plaintiff (name or names): E

CIV5|8YOL

SHORT TITLE:"

Adut v. Burnside

4. [_] Plaintiff (name): is doing business under the fictitious name (specify): and has complied with the fictitious business name laws. 5. Each defendant named above is a natural person a. [ except defendant (name): c¢. [_] except defendant (name): (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (1) [__] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) (] a corporation (2) [__] a corporation (3) [ ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (5) [_] other (specify): . (5) [_] other (specify): b. [__] except defendant (name): d. [__] except defendant (name): (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (1) [_] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) [_] acorporation - (2) [_] a corporation (3) [ an unincomporated entity (describe): (3) I:I an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [ ] a public entity (describe): (5) [ other (specify): | (5) [ other (specify): ~ [ information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained“in Attachment 5. 6. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff. a. [_] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): : were the agents or employees of other named defendants and acted within the scope of.that agency or employment. i b. [_] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to ~ plaintiff. ' 7. [ Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names): 8. This courtis the proper court because a. [__] at least one defendant now resides in its jurisdictional area. b. [_] the principal place of business of a defendant corporation or unincorporated association is in its jurisdictional area. c. [ X] injury to person or damage to personal property occurred in its jurisdictional area. and, d. [X] other (specity): g condesnpt of covrt Was done in dhe San Hafee Coundly Sopener Court 9. [_] Piaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [} has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [__] is excused from complying because (specify): ’

4. [_] Plaintiff (name): is doing business under the fictitious name (specify): and has complied with the fictitious business name laws. 5. Each defendant named above is a natural person a. [ except defendant (name): c¢. [_] except defendant (name): (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (1) [__] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) (] a corporation (2) [__] a corporation (3) [ ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (5) [_] other (specify): . (5) [_] other (specify): b. [__] except defendant (name): d. [__] except defendant (name): (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (1) [_] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) [_] acorporation - (2) [_] a corporation (3) [ an unincomporated entity (describe): (3) I:I an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [ ] a public entity (describe): (5) [ other (specify): | (5) [ other (specify): ~ [ information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained“in Attachment 5. 6. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff. a. [_] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): : were the agents or employees of other named defendants and acted within the scope of.that agency or employment. i b. [_] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to ~ plaintiff. ' 7. [ Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names): 8. This courtis the proper court because a. [__] at least one defendant now resides in its jurisdictional area. b. [_] the principal place of business of a defendant corporation or unincorporated association is in its jurisdictional area. c. [ X] injury to person or damage to personal property occurred in its jurisdictional area. and, d. [X] other (specity): g condesnpt of covrt Was done in dhe San Hafee Coundly Sopener Court 9. [_] Piaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [} has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [__] is excused from complying because (specify): ’ »00’\d' 0“

»00’\d' 0“

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE.

CASE NUMBER-

Civ S8 Yoo

10. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): .

a. [__] Motor Vehicle

b. [3{] General Negligence c. [XJ Intentional Tort d e f.

. Aduvd v. Buomside.

. [_] Products Liability [ ] Premises Liability

[X] Other (specify): C,Cu"r-\e,h«_,{r\' of Court nolaticnhs ofF Businesy and Prv(’ess;o e Code & (oob’-&([x\)/ $60e3(d), oppression, malice

{axwl her chil dhun 11. Plaintiff has suffered

a. [__] wage loss

b. [X] loss of use of property . [ hospital and medical expenses [»<] general damage [] property damage [X] loss of eaming capacity

X7 other damage (specify): Sz 0L ,@L’VLCHOV\&Q dL})‘H"Q%/ s vfen G, COSte p loss of :'ncpm:e,

@ ~0aop

12 [_] The damages claimed for wrongful death and the relationships of plaintiff to the deceased are a. [__] listed in Attachment 12.

b. [_] as follows:

13. The relief sought in this complaint is within the jurisdiction of this court.

14. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. (1) [XJ compensatory damages (2) punitive damages The amount of damages is (in cases for personal injury or wrongful death, you must check (1)): (1) according to proof (2) [_] in the amount of $

15. [X_] The paragraphs of this complaint alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers): .

FR2 (C), PR~2(J)

Decomber 10,2012, (Z,,(_@\ o™ Date: L oAV e }i AL Esler Adat ) &al}/\ Goud

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNECK, MARGARET M