Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/22/2018 at 03:16:10 (UTC).

ESTATE OF WILLIE F. ROBERSON

Case Summary

On 11/14/2013 ESTATE OF WILLIE F ROBERSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Miram, George A, Scott, Joseph C, Miram, George A., Scott, Joseph C. and Runde, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3908

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Miram, George A

Scott, Joseph C

Miram, George A.

Scott, Joseph C.

Runde, John

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

ROBERSON, ISAIAH

WYCOFF, VAREE

ROBERSON, MATTHEW

ROBERSON, WILLIE, JR

ROBERSON, MARIO

ROBERSON, SHONTA

BRADY, ROBERT JAMES

SMITH, ANNE F

ROBERSON, MAGGIE

ROBERSON, CHARLOTTE

Decedent

ROBERSON, WILLIE F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BRIDGMAN, JAMES C.

WYCOFF, VAREE

SOLORIO, LAWRENCE

BRADY, ROBERT JAMES

PACKARD, DAVID R.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LOGAN, ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

Request for Special Notice.

Request for Special Notice

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order

Declaration.

Declaration IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND COURT ORDERS; TO STO Comment IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND COURT ORDERS; TO STOP SPENDING ESTATE ASSETS; TO LIST THE PROPERTY AT FULL VALUE ETC

Petition.

PETITION 1ST ACCOUNT & REPORT OF ADMINISTRATIX PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS RE MORTGAGES ETC FILED BY Comment PPE: PETITION 1ST ACCOUNT & REPORT OF ADMINISTRATIX, PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS RE MORTGAGES ETC FILED BY ANNE F SMITH.

Conversion Action.

$952000.00 BOND #23031 FILED BY ANNE F SMITH Comment BF: $952,000.00 BOND #23031 FILED BY ANNE F SMITH

Notice.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY ANNE F SMITH. Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY ANNE F SMITH.

Conversion Action.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED REMOVING ATTORNEY ROBERT MIRANDA AS TO MATTHEW ROBERSON. PARTY IS NO Comment SAT1: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED REMOVING ATTORNEY ROBERT MIRANDA AS TO MATTHEW ROBERSON. PARTY IS NOW ACTING IN PRO/PER.

Document.

CLERICAL CORRECTION & STIPULATION TO AMEND THE ORDER ETC SIGNED BY MIRAM ON 9/12/14, FILED. Comment FILED: CLERICAL CORRECTION & STIPULATION TO AMEND THE ORDER, ETC SIGNED BY MIRAM ON 9/12/14, FILED.

Petition.

PETITION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY PETITIONERS TO THE APPOINTMENT OF ETC FILED BY CHARLOTTE ROBERSON, Comment PPE: PETITION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY PETITIONERS TO THE APPOINTMENT OF, ETC FILED BY CHARLOTTE ROBERSON, MAGGIE ROBERSON, ISAIAH ROBERSON, MARIO ROBERSON, MATTHEW ROBERSON.

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order

Declaration.

Declaration OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION OF ADMINISTRATRIX ANNE F. SMITH ET Comment OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION OF ADMINISTRATRIX ANNE F. SMITH, ETC.

Reply Filed.

Reply Filed TO RESPONSE OF ADMINISTRATRIX ANNE F. SMITH TO OBJECTIONS OF CHARLOTTE ROBERSON TO PETIT Comment TO RESPONSE OF ADMINISTRATRIX ANNE F. SMITH TO OBJECTIONS OF CHARLOTTE ROBERSON TO PETITION FOR ORDERS ETC

Order.

Order AFTER HRG ON PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION FOR SERVIDESETL Comment AFTER HRG ON PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION FOR SERVIDES,ETL

Conversion Action.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED REMOVING ATTORNEY ROBERT MIRANDA AS TO ISAIAH ROBERSON. PARTY IS NOW Comment SAT1: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED REMOVING ATTORNEY ROBERT MIRANDA AS TO ISAIAH ROBERSON. PARTY IS NOW ACTING IN PRO/PER.

Petition.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION - LIMITED AUTHORITY FILED BY MAGGIE ROBERSON. Comment PPE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION - LIMITED AUTHORITY FILED BY MAGGIE ROBERSON.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF HEARING & PROOF OF SERVICE RE FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY PETITIONERS T Comment NHP: NOTICE OF HEARING & PROOF OF SERVICE RE FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY PETITIONERS TO THE ETC SERVED ON SEE SERV LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/14

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF OBJECTION TO PETITION ETC... SERVED ON GENE L. OSOFSKY WITH A SERVIC Comment PSN3I: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF OBJECTION TO PETITION, ETC... SERVED ON GENE L. OSOFSKY WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 12/12/13 FILED.

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED. SERVED ON 11/19/13. Comment PSMNPA: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED. SERVED ON 11/19/13.

198 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Miram George A.; Judgment Type; Judgment; Comment; Comment; (CONFIRMING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt. Additional Info: Receipt RECEIPTS AND CANCELED DISTRIBUTION CHECKS TO DISTRIBUTEES PER JUDGMENT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION Comment RECEIPTS AND CANCELED DISTRIBUTION CHECKS TO DISTRIBUTEES PER JUDGMENT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED ON 11/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Comment:. Additional Info: Comment ORDER FILED AT FRONT COUNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: Order APPROVING & SETTLING SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT ETC. Comment APPROVING & SETTLING SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition Hearing. Additional Info: *PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 02/06/2018 Judicial Officer Probate - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment ADMINISTRATIX' SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT & STATUS REPORT AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ADMINISTRIX ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received APPROVING AND SETTLING SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT. ETC Comment APPROVING AND SETTLING SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT. ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing & Proof of Service (by Mail) re ADMINISTRATIX' SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT & STATUS REPOR Comment ADMINISTRATIX' SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT & STATUS REPORT AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ADMINISTRIX ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Court Reporter service less than one hour.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition (Subsequent). Additional Info: Petition (Subsequent) ADMINISTRATIX' SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT & STATUS REPORT AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE Comment ADMINISTRATIX' SUPPLEMENTAL ACCOUNT & STATUS REPORT AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ADMINISTRIX ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
665 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2013
  • Financial info for ROBERSON, CHARLOTTE : Case Payment Receipt # 201311140568 ROBERSON, CHARLOTTE $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Financial info for ROBERSON, CHARLOTTE : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Financial: ROBERSON, CHARLOTTE; Total Financial Assessment $1,455.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial info for ROBERSON, SHONTA : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-026653-HOJ SWIFT ATTORNEY SERVICE $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial info for ROBERSON, SHONTA : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial info for ROBERSON, SHONTA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial: ROBERSON, SHONTA; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Financial info for ROBERSON, WILLIE F. : Case Payment Receipt # 201311140567 ROBERSON, WILLIE F. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Financial info for ROBERSON, WILLIE F. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Financial: ROBERSON, WILLIE F.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Logan, Robert Mauri