This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:34:20 (UTC).

Estate of THOMAS JOSEPH WALSH

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 Estate of THOMAS JOSEPH WALSH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brown, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0587

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brown, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WALSH, THOMAS JOHN

Decedent

WALSH, THOMAS JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TONG, DARON D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Letters of Administration Hearing.

*PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing 07/06/2018 Judicial Officer Brown Gilbert Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: TONG, DARON D

Proof of Publication of.

Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

Duties and Liabilities signed.

Duties and Liabilities signed

Petition for Letters of.

Petition for Letters of Administration Comment Administration

Notice of Administration to Creditors.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • Letters of Administration Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Probate - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration Hearing. Additional Info: *PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing 07/06/2018 Judicial Officer Brown Gilbert Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: TONG, DARON D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication of. Additional Info: Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Confidential Statement of Birthdate & Drivers License signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities signed. Additional Info: Duties and Liabilities signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Administration to Creditors. Additional Info: Notice of Administration to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate. Additional Info: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Court Reporter service less than one hour.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of. Additional Info: Petition for Letters of Administration Comment Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for WALSH, THOMAS JOHN : Mail Payment Receipt # 2018-037466-HOJ TONG, DARON D $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for WALSH, THOMAS JOHN : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for WALSH, THOMAS JOHN : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: WALSH, THOMAS JOHN; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less