This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 14:25:39 (UTC).

Estate of Thomas David Leong

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Estate of Thomas David Leong was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0316

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Yet Classified and Not Classified By Court

Leong-Jang, Linda Rae

Decedent

Leong, Thomas David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GALLIGAN, PATRICK T.

 

Court Documents

Duties and Liabilities signed.

Duties and Liabilities signed

Petition for Letters of.

Petition for Probate Comment Administration

Order for Probate; Personal Representative.

Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Administrator with Full Authority. Bond: NA. Comment appointed as Administrator with Full Authority. Bond: NA. Deposits: NA Expires: NA

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee.

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee Comment Probate Referee appointed: William Gray

Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate & Proof of.

Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate & Proof of Service by Mail served on SEE SERVICE LIS Comment Service by Mail served on SEE SERVICE LIST Service Date 3/2/2021

Affidavit of Publication of.

Affidavit of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

Document Returned:.

Document Returned: Comment LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION returned to PATRICK T. GALLIGAN Reason: REQUEST FOR CA PROBATE REFEREE REQUIRED PRIOR TO ISSUANCE OF LETTERS

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative.

Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative with FULL authority Comment with FULL authority

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee.

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee Probate Referee appointed: William Gray Comment Probate Referee appointed: William Gray

Document Returned:.

Document Returned: Comment LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION returned to PATRICK T. GALLIGAN Reason: REQUEST FOR CA PROBATE REFEREE REQUIRED PRIOR TO ISSUANCE OF LETTERS

Duties and Liabilities signed.

Duties and Liabilities signed

Order for Probate; Personal Representative.

Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Administrator with Full Authority. Bond: NA. Comment appointed as Administrator with Full Authority. Bond: NA. Deposits: NA Expires: NA

Letters of Administration Hearing.

Original Type Letters of Administration Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing 04/22/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

Affidavit of Publication of.

Affidavit of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate & Proof of.

Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate & Proof of Service by Mail served on SEE SERVICE LIS Comment Service by Mail served on SEE SERVICE LIST Service Date 3/2/2021

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Leong-Jang, Linda Rae; Case Payment Receipt # 2021-020848-HOJ LAW OFFICES OF PATRICK T. GALLIGAN $81.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Leong-Jang, Linda Rae; Transaction Assessment $81.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Leong-Jang, Linda Rae; Total Financial Assessment $81.00; Total Payments and Credits $81.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration issued to Personal Representative.; Additional Info: Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative with FULL authority Comment with FULL authority

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Appointment of CA Probate Referee.; Additional Info: Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee Probate Referee appointed: William Gray Comment Probate Referee appointed: William Gray

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Returned:.; Additional Info: Document Returned: Comment LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION returned to PATRICK T. GALLIGAN Reason: REQUEST FOR CA PROBATE REFEREE REQUIRED PRIOR TO ISSUANCE OF LETTERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketConfidential Statement of Birthdate & Drivers License signed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities signed.; Additional Info: Duties and Liabilities signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate; Personal Representative.; Additional Info: Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Administrator with Full Authority. Bond: NA. Comment appointed as Administrator with Full Authority. Bond: NA. Deposits: NA Expires: NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Letters of Administration Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing 04/22/2021 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication of.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate & Proof of.; Additional Info: Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate & Proof of Service by Mail served on SEE SERVICE LIS Comment Service by Mail served on SEE SERVICE LIST Service Date 3/2/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for LEONG-JANG, LINDA RAE; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-007534-HOJ LEONG-JANG, LINDA RAE $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for LEONG-JANG, LINDA RAE; Transaction Assessment $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; LEONG-JANG, LINDA RAE; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate.; Additional Info: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of.; Additional Info: Petition for Letters of Administration Comment Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALLIGAN, PATRICK T.