This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/27/2023 at 00:46:48 (UTC).

Estate of Robert Owen Harvey

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Estate of Robert Owen Harvey was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Greenberg, Susan, Scott, Joseph C and Miram, George A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0846

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Greenberg, Susan

Scott, Joseph C

Miram, George A

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

Harvey, Tammy

Decedent

Harvey, Robert Owen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

KASS, BRADLEY M.

BREWER, JANET L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee.

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee Probate Referee appointed: Michael G. Kasolas Comment Probate Referee appointed: Michael G. Kasolas

Notice of Proposed Action.

Notice of Proposed Action Consent Comment Consent

Notice of Proposed Action.

Notice of Proposed Action Consent Comment Consent

Notice of Proposed Action.

Notice of Proposed Action Consent Comment Consent

Notice of Administration to Creditors.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to

Inventory & Appraisal.

Inventory & Appraisal SUPPLEMENTAL Comment SUPPLEMENTAL

Notice of Proposed Action.

Notice of Proposed Action

Notice of Proposed Action.

Notice of Proposed Action

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by SIGNED BY MICHAEL REIBIN Comment SIGNED BY MICHAEL REIBIN

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by SIGNED BY ANTONIO BOLANOS Comment SIGNED BY ANTONIO BOLANOS

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by JOSEPH DOBSON Comment JOSEPH DOBSON

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by GREG ROBBA Comment GREG ROBBA

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by JACKY AVERILL Comment JACKY AVERILL

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by JACKY AVERILL Comment JACKY AVERILL

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by JACKIE COOPER Comment JACKIE COOPER

Order for Final Distribution - Decedent's Estate.

Order for Final Distribution - Decedent's Estate ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION A Comment ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND FOR PAYMENT OF COMPENSATION TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ATTORNEY AND FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES

Ex Parte Cover Sheet.

Ex Parte Cover Sheet

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by SIGNED BY MICHAEL REIBIN Comment SIGNED BY MICHAEL REIBIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by SIGNED BY ANTONIO BOLANOS Comment SIGNED BY ANTONIO BOLANOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by JOSEPH DOBSON Comment JOSEPH DOBSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by GREG ROBBA Comment GREG ROBBA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by JACKY AVERILL Comment JACKY AVERILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by JACKY AVERILL Comment JACKY AVERILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by JACKIE COOPER Comment JACKIE COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harvey, Tammy; Case Payment Receipt # 2022-043963-HOJ BREWER, JANET L. $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harvey, Tammy; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Harvey, Tammy; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness.; Additional Info: Proof of Subscribing Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Comment Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harvey, Tammy; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-028037-HOJ Harvey, Tammy $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harvey, Tammy; Transaction Assessment $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Harvey, Tammy; Total Financial Assessment $1,441.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,441.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities signed.; Additional Info: Duties and Liabilities signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate.; Additional Info: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of.; Additional Info: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary and Authorization to Administer Under the Comment Will and for Letters Testamentary and Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less