This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 02:04:55 (UTC).

Estate of Reba K Venezia

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Estate of Reba K Venezia was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A. and Miram, George A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1171

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A.

Miram, George A

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

Davis, Carol Janeen

Decedent

Venezia, Reba K

Not Yet Classified

DAVIS, CAROL JAVEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

WIGGS, GEOFFREY E.

 

Court Documents

Inventory & Appraisal.

4152966_092DE160p1Si Comment PARTIAL NO. 1

Will Admitted to Probate and Filed.

Will Admitted to Probate and Filed COPY OF WILL Comment COPY OF WILL

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee.

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee Probate Referee appointed: William Gray Comment Probate Referee appointed: William Gray

Order for Probate; Personal Representative.

Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Executor with Full Authority. Bond: N/A. Dep Comment appointed as Executor with Full Authority. Bond: N/A. Deposits: N/A Expires: N/A

Letters Testamentary issued to Personal Representative.

Letters Testamentary issued to Personal Representative with FULL authority Comment with FULL authority

Duties and Liabilities signed.

4000969_056DE147Duti

Probate of Lost Will and Letters Testamentary w/ ATA.

Original Type Probate of Lost Will and Letters Testamentary w/ ATA ~PRO Minute Order - Probate of Lost Will and Letters Testamentary w/ ATA 11/05/2020 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Proof of Publication of.

Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF REBA VENEZIA Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF REBA VENEZIA

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

Petition for Probate of.

Petition for Probate of Lost Will and for Letters Testamentary and Authorization to Administer Under Comment Lost Will and for Letters Testamentary and Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal. Additional Info: Inventory & Appraisal PARTIAL NO. 1 Comment PARTIAL NO. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWill Admitted to Probate and Filed. Additional Info: Will Admitted to Probate and Filed COPY OF WILL Comment COPY OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Davis, Carol Janeen : Case Payment Receipt # 2020-043808-HOJ WIGGS, GEOFFREY E. $81.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Davis, Carol Janeen : Transaction Assessment $81.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters Testamentary issued to Personal Representative. Additional Info: Letters Testamentary issued to Personal Representative with FULL authority Comment with FULL authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Appointment of CA Probate Referee. Additional Info: Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee Probate Referee appointed: William Gray Comment Probate Referee appointed: William Gray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate; Personal Representative. Additional Info: Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Executor with Full Authority. Bond: N/A. Dep Comment appointed as Executor with Full Authority. Bond: N/A. Deposits: N/A Expires: N/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketConfidential Statement of Birthdate & Drivers License signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities signed. Additional Info: Duties and Liabilities signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate of Lost Will and Letters Testamentary w/ ATA. Additional Info: Original Type Probate of Lost Will and Letters Testamentary w/ ATA ~PRO Minute Order - Probate of Lost Will and Letters Testamentary w/ ATA 11/05/2020 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication of. Additional Info: Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF REBA VENEZIA Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF REBA VENEZIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Davis, Carol Janeen : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036369-HOJ Davis, Carol Janeen $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Davis, Carol Janeen : Transaction Assessment $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Davis, Carol Janeen; Total Financial Assessment $546.00; Total Payments and Credits $546.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of. Additional Info: Petition for Probate of Lost Will and for Letters Testamentary and Authorization to Administer Under Comment Lost Will and for Letters Testamentary and Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate. Additional Info: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less