This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:53:07 (UTC).

ESTATE OF PATRICIA A. STEVENS

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 ESTATE OF PATRICIA A STEVENS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A and Miram, George A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2598

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A

Miram, George A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAN MATEO CO PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

Decedent

STEVENS, PATRICIA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JOHN C. BEIERS

 

Court Documents

Inventory & Appraisal.

FILING (3) Comment IA: PARTIAL #1 INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED; 2 ATTACHMENTS

Conversion Action.

CLAIM (4) Comment CRC: CREDITOR`S CLAIM AN INDIVIDUAL OR ENTITY DBA ALL ANIMAL MOBILE ETC IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00 FILED. CLAIMANT: SUSAN MACINNES DVM

Conversion Action.

CLAIM Comment CRC: CREDITOR`S CLAIM A CORPORATION IN THE AMOUNT OF $3501.65 FILED. CLAIMANT: CBSJ FINANCIAL

Inventory & Appraisal.

FILING (19) Comment IA: SUPPLEMENTAL NO.: 3 INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED; ONE ATTACHMENTS

Conversion Action.

CLAIM (3) Comment CRC: CREDITOR`S CLAIM ASSIGNED CREDITOR IN THE AMOUNT OF $26.34 FILED. CLAIMANT: STANISLAUS CREDIT CONTROL SERVICE INC

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (2) Comment NPA2: NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION SALE OF REAL PROPERTY 127 MADRID AVE EL GRANDAETC

Inventory & Appraisal.

FILING (16) Comment IA: SUPPLEMENTAL NO.: 2 INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED; ONE ATTACHMENTS

Amended.

AMENDED FILING Comment AMENI: AMENDED PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION & AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER ETC FILED BY SAN MATEO CO PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECI: DECLARATION OF DILIGENT SEARCH IN LOCATING HEIRS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSMNPA: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED. SERVED ON 08/06/12.

Inventory & Appraisal.

FILING (6) Comment IA: SUPPLEMENTAL NO. 1 INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED; 1 ATTACHMENTS

Conversion Action.

CLAIM (2) Comment CRC: CREDITOR`S CLAIM A CORPORATION IN THE AMOUNT OF $101.77 FILED. CLAIMANT: J&L COLLECTION SERVICES INC

Conversion Action.

FILING (15) Comment AREJC: ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED; CLAIM IS ALLOWED FOR $50.00.

Inventory & Appraisal.

FILING (20) Comment IA: CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL NO: 1 INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED; ONE ATTACHMENTS

Inventory & Appraisal.

FILING (5) Comment IA: FINAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED; #2 ATTACHMENTS

Request for Appointment of California Probate Referee filed.

REQUEST Comment REQPRI: REQUEST FOR PROBATE REFEREE FILED BY SAN MATEO CO PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (8) Comment NHP: NOTICE OF HEARING & PROOF OF SERVICE RE FINAL REPORT & PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ACCOUNT ALLOWANCE ETC SERVED ON SEE SRV LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/16

Inventory & Appraisal.

FILING (4) Comment IA: PARTIAL #2 INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT FILED; #1 ATTACHMENTS

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Completed; Converted Disposition; 0001 LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; A.T.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order and Final Distribution. Additional Info: ORDER (17) Comment OFFD: ORDER SETTLING FINAL ACCT & REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR ALLOWING COMP TO ADMINISTRATOR & ATTYS ETC. AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: FILE RET'D; ORDER SIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY ASIEVERT ON 04/12/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FOS: FORMAL ORDER SUBMITTED AND SIGNED BY THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PG: PETITION GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment NAP: NO APPEARANCE IS MADE BY ANY PARTIES HEREIN OR THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Miram George A. Comment JCRB: HONORABLE GEORGE A. MIRAM, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: ANN SIEVERT, COURT REPORTER: LORNA TRAUBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Miram George A. Comment HEARING RE: FINAL REPORT & PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ACCOUNT ALLOWANCE OF ETC AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Petition for Final Distribution. Additional Info: Original Type Petition for Final Distribution Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Dept: 28 HEARING RE: FINAL REPORT & PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ACCOUNT ALLOWANCE OF ETC AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication of. Additional Info: FILING Comment PRFPUB: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NTC OF PET TO ADMINSTER ESTATE OF PATRICIA STEVENS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended. Additional Info: AMENDED FILING Comment AMENI: AMENDED PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION & AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER ETC FILED BY SAN MATEO CO PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment OAPR: ORDER APPOINTING WILLIAM R. GRAY AS CALIFORNIA PROBATE REFEREE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee. Additional Info: REQUEST Comment REQPRI: REQUEST FOR PROBATE REFEREE FILED BY SAN MATEO CO PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECI: DECLARATION OF DILIGENT SEARCH IN LOCATING HEIRS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition. Additional Info: PETITION Comment PPEI: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION & AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE IAEA FILED BY SAN MATEO CO PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSMNPA: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED. SERVED ON 08/06/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate. Additional Info: NOTICE Comment NPAE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Petition. Additional Info: Comment PPF: PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less