This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 19:20:58 (UTC).

ESTATE OF JOHN C. RACKERS

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 ESTATE OF JOHN C RACKERS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L and Scott, Joseph C. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0159

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L

Scott, Joseph C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rackers, Marlene a

Decedent

Rackers, John C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SULLIVAN, JAMES M.

 

Court Documents

Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition - Initial.

Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition - Initial

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re Spousal/ Domestic Partner Property Petition Comment Spousal/ Domestic Partner Property Petition

Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition - Initial.

Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition - Initial

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re Spousal/ Domestic Partner Property Petition Comment Spousal/ Domestic Partner Property Petition

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received Spousal Property Order Comment Spousal Property Order

Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition.

Original Type Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition ~PRO Minute Order - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition 05/24/2022 Judicial Officer Scott Joseph C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Court's Motion Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SULLIVAN, JAMES M.

Ex Parte Petition.

Ex Parte Petition EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING CASE FOR HEARING Comment EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING CASE FOR HEARING

Ex Parte Proposed Order.

Ex Parte Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SET CASE FOR HEARING Comment ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SET CASE FOR HEARING

Order Denying.

Order Denying ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVNCE AND SET CASE FOR HEARING Comment ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVNCE AND SET CASE FOR HEARING

Ex Parte Cover Sheet.

Ex Parte Cover Sheet DENIED Comment DENIED

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition.

Original Type Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition ~PRO Minute Order - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition 08/17/2022 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketPetition denied.; Additional Info: Comment The court finds/orders: DENIED for failure to include Attachment 7 & because the Petition directly contradicts the terms of decedents pour-over will.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSpousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition.; Additional Info: Original Type Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition ~PRO Minute Order - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition 08/17/2022 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Ex Parte Cover Sheet DENIED Comment DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying.; Additional Info: Order Denying ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVNCE AND SET CASE FOR HEARING Comment ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVNCE AND SET CASE FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rackers, Marlene a; Case Payment Receipt # 2022-020680-HOJ SULLIVAN, JAMES M. $120.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rackers, Marlene a; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rackers, Marlene a; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Proposed Order.; Additional Info: Ex Parte Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SET CASE FOR HEARING Comment ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SET CASE FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Fee Paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Petition.; Additional Info: Ex Parte Petition EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING CASE FOR HEARING Comment EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING CASE FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Dan Siegel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSpousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition.; Additional Info: Original Type Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition ~PRO Minute Order - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition 05/24/2022 Judicial Officer Scott Joseph C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Court's Motion Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SULLIVAN, JAMES M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received Spousal Property Order Comment Spousal Property Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rackers, Marlene a; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-005937-HOJ Rackers, Marlene a $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rackers, Marlene a; Transaction Assessment $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Rackers, Marlene a; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re Spousal/ Domestic Partner Property Petition Comment Spousal/ Domestic Partner Property Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSpousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition - Initial.; Additional Info: Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition - Initial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less