This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/09/2022 at 03:06:31 (UTC).

Estate of Georgette Y Sarles

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 Estate of Georgette Y Sarles was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A., Grandsaert, John L, Miram, George A and Scott, Joseph C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0343

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A.

Grandsaert, John L

Scott, Joseph C

Miram, George A

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

Marignac, John A

Sarles, Ronald

Claimant and Other

Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD

Decedents

Sarles, Georgette Y

COLHOUR, GEORGETTE

Sarles, Georgette Y.

Sarles, Georgette

Others

Webcom, Inc.

KIMCO WESTLAKE L.P

Matamoros, Jose

Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD

Petitioners, Not Yet Classified and Not Classified By Court

Sarles, Ronald

MARIGNAC, JOHN A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Not Yet Classified Attorney

LUZAICH, STEVAN N.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Notice of Proposed Action.

Notice of Proposed Action

Creditor's Claim.

Creditor's Claim Claimant: Tri Counties Bank in the amount of $ 756868.07 Comment Claimant: Tri Counties Bank in the amount of $ 756,868.07

Notice of Administration to Creditors.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim Re: Creditor JOSE MATAMOROSClaim is REJECTEDFor $ 7487 Comment Re: Creditor JOSE MATAMOROS Claim is REJECTED For $ 74,873.59

Inventory & Appraisal.

Inventory & Appraisal PARTIAL NO. 1 Comment PARTIAL NO. 1

Notice of Proposed Action.

Notice of Proposed Action Notice of Proposed Action - $60k Loan Comment Notice of Proposed Action - $60k Loan

Document filed:.

Document filed: Status Report of Co-Administrators Comment Status Report of Co-Administrators

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim Re: Creditor WEBCOM INC.Claim is ALLOWEDFor $ 247400.0 Comment Re: Creditor WEBCOM INC. Claim is ALLOWED For $ 247,400.00

Status Hearing.

Original Type Status Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Status Hearing 04/15/2022 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Report.

Report STATUS REPORT OF CO-ADMINSTRATORS Comment STATUS REPORT OF CO-ADMINSTRATORS

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Notice of Proposed Action.

Notice of Proposed Action

Order.

Order ORDER APPROVING PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTIONS OF CAPITAL GAINS ON WIVER OF ACCOUNT AND PURUSUANT Comment ORDER APPROVING PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTIONS OF CAPITAL GAINS ON WIVER OF ACCOUNT, AND PURUSUANT TO CONSENT OF ALL BENEFICIARIES

Petition (Subsequent).

Petition (Subsequent) for Preliminary Distribution - ex parte Comment for Preliminary Distribution - ex parte

Ex Parte Order.

Ex Parte Order ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Comment ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Ex Parte Proposed Order.

Ex Parte Proposed Order ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Comment ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; WAIVERS OF NOTICE Comment EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; WAIVERS OF NOTICE

227 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Status Hearing ~PRO Minute Order - Status Hearing 04/15/2022 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport.; Additional Info: Report STATUS REPORT OF CO-ADMINSTRATORS Comment STATUS REPORT OF CO-ADMINSTRATORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Proposed Action.; Additional Info: Notice of Proposed Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Marignac, John A; Case Payment Receipt # 2022-007849-HOJ LUZAICH, STEVAN N. $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Marignac, John A; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Marignac, John A; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order ORDER APPROVING PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTIONS OF CAPITAL GAINS ON WIVER OF ACCOUNT AND PURUSUANT Comment ORDER APPROVING PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTIONS OF CAPITAL GAINS ON WIVER OF ACCOUNT, AND PURUSUANT TO CONSENT OF ALL BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (Subsequent).; Additional Info: Petition (Subsequent) for Preliminary Distribution - ex parte Comment for Preliminary Distribution - ex parte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Fee Paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Comment Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Marignac, John A; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-015672-HOJ Marignac, John A $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Marignac, John A; Transaction Assessment $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Marignac, John A; Total Financial Assessment $1,140.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate.; Additional Info: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketConfidential Statement of Birthdate & Drivers License signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities signed.; Additional Info: Duties and Liabilities signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of.; Additional Info: Petition for Letters of Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Comment Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUZAICH, STEVAN N.