This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:32 (UTC).

ESTATE OF BRADFORD LOUIE

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 ESTATE OF BRADFORD LOUIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PFEIFFER, ROSEMARY, Dylina, Steven L and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2477

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

PFEIFFER, ROSEMARY

Dylina, Steven L

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOUIE, CALVIN

Decedent

LOUIE, BRADFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SACKS, MASON J.

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

FILING (5) Comment RECI: RECEIPT BY DISTRIBURTEE SIGNED BY GREGORY M LIM

Conversion Action.

PETITION (3) Comment EPP: EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER SIGNED BY JDG.MIRAM ON 9/10/13 FILED BY CALVIN LOUIE

Order for Probate filed; Personal Representative.

ORDER Comment OPF2: ORDER FOR PROBATE FILED; CALVIN LOUIE APPOINTED ADMINISTRATOR WITH FULL AUTHORITY. BOND: N/A. DEPOSITS: 0.00.

Conversion Action.

FILING (4) Comment RECI: RECEIPT BY DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY CALVIN LOUIE

Conversion Action.

WAIVER (3) Comment WFI: WAIVER OF BOND FILED.

Conversion Action.

WAIVER Comment WFI: WAIVER OF BOND SG BY GREGORY M LIM FILED.

Conversion Action.

FILING (6) Comment RECI: RECEIPT BY DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY KELLY E HOLLOWAY

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSMNPA: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED. SERVED ON 06/27/12.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate.

NOTICE Comment NPAE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative.

FILING (2) Comment LA: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO CALVIN LOUIE WITH FULL AUTHORITY

Notice of Hearing re.

NOTICE (2) Comment NH1: NOTICE OF HEARING RE WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PET FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATIONETC FILED

Petition.

PETITION Comment PPEI: PETITION FPR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH ATA FILED BY CALVIN LOUIE.

Request for Appointment of California Probate Referee filed.

REQUEST Comment REQPRI: REQUEST FOR PROBATE REFEREE FILED BY CALVIN LOUIE

Conversion Action.

WAIVER (2) Comment WFI: WAIVER OF BOND SIG BY KELLY E. HOLLOWAY FILED.

Bond By Surety Filed.

BOND Comment B1: BOND #1000938794 BY SURETY U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY IN THE AMOUNT OF $835000.00 FILED BY CALVIN LOUIE AS ADMINISTRATOR.

Petition.

PETITION (2) Comment PPEI: PETITION WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING;FINAL DISTRIBUTION;ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ADMINISTRATORETC FILED BY CALVIN LOUIE.

Proof of Publication of.

FILING Comment PRFPUI: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

Conversion Action.

COURT DOCUMENT (2) Comment DLI: DUTIES AND LIABILITIES SIGNED BY CALVIN LOUIE.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Order of Final Distribution; Converted Disposition; 0001 LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; WWA; A.T.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: PETITION (3) Comment EPP: EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER SIGNED BY JDG.MIRAM ON 9/10/13 FILED BY CALVIN LOUIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Ex Parte sent to Department to. Additional Info: Comment EFS: EX-PARTE SENT TO DEPARTMENT 28 ON 09/09/13 AT 10:00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: FILING (6) Comment RECI: RECEIPT BY DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY KELLY E HOLLOWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: FILING (5) Comment RECI: RECEIPT BY DISTRIBURTEE SIGNED BY GREGORY M LIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: FILING (4) Comment RECI: RECEIPT BY DISTRIBUTEE SIGNED BY CALVIN LOUIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: FILE RETURNED; ORD SG & FILED;COPY MAILED TO MASON J SACKS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: ORDER (2) Comment OJFD: ORDER/JUDGMENT ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY LORRAINE ON 08/23/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FOS: FORMAL ORDER SUBMITTED AND SIGNED BY THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: COURT DOCUMENT (2) Comment DLI: DUTIES AND LIABILITIES SIGNED BY CALVIN LOUIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition. Additional Info: PETITION Comment PPEI: PETITION FPR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH ATA FILED BY CALVIN LOUIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate. Additional Info: NOTICE Comment NPAE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CPIE: PLEADING AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Financial info for LOUIE, CALVIN : Case Payment Receipt # 201307190622 LOUIE, CALVIN $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Financial info for LOUIE, CALVIN : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Financial: LOUIE, CALVIN; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for LOUIE, BRADFORD : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260908 LOUIE, BRADFORD $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for LOUIE, BRADFORD : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: LOUIE, BRADFORD; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less