This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 02:10:55 (UTC).

Estate of Beverly Bernell Myres

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Estate of Beverly Bernell Myres was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A. and Miram, George A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1176

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A.

Miram, George A

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Not Yet Classified

Myres, Jennifer

Assignee

Inheritance Advanced

Decedent

Myres, Beverly Bernell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HALL, MERCY L

 

Court Documents

Request for Special Notice.

Request for Special Notice

Notice.

Notice OF ASSIGNMENT Comment OF ASSIGNMENT

Notice.

Notice OF ASSIGNMENT Comment OF ASSIGNMENT

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Petition for Letters of.

Petition for Letters of Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Comment Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative.

Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative with LIMITED authority Comment with LIMITED authority

Order for Probate; Personal Representative.

Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Administrator with Limited Authority. Bond: Comment appointed as Administrator with Limited Authority. Bond: NA. Deposits: NA Expires: NA

Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA.

Original Type Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA ~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA 12/16/2020 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment *Continued from 11/09/2020

Proof of Publication of.

Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINSTER ESTATE OF BEVERLY BERNELL MYRES Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINSTER ESTATE OF BEVERLY BERNELL MYRES

Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA.

Original Type Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA ~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA 11/09/2020 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: HALL, MERCY L

Petition for Letters of.

Petition for Letters of Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Comment Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

Document filed:.

Document filed: Jennifer Myres Assignment 2 to Inheritance Advanced Comment Jennifer Myres Assignment 2 to Inheritance Advanced

Proof of Publication of.

Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF BEVERLY BERNELL MYRES Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF BEVERLY BERNELL MYRES

Duties and Liabilities signed.

Duties and Liabilities signed

Document filed:.

Document filed: Jennifer Myers Assignment to Inheritance Advanced Comment Jennifer Myers Assignment to Inheritance Advanced

Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer.

Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Comment Estate

Notice.

Notice Notice of Assignment Comment Notice of Assignment

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration issued to Personal Representative. Additional Info: Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative with LIMITED authority Comment with LIMITED authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate; Personal Representative. Additional Info: Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Administrator with Limited Authority. Bond: Comment appointed as Administrator with Limited Authority. Bond: NA. Deposits: NA Expires: NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration Hearing with ATA. Additional Info: Original Type Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA ~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA 12/16/2020 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment *Continued from 11/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication of. Additional Info: Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINSTER ESTATE OF BEVERLY BERNELL MYRES Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINSTER ESTATE OF BEVERLY BERNELL MYRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration Hearing with ATA. Additional Info: Original Type Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA ~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA 11/09/2020 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: HALL, MERCY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument filed:. Additional Info: Document filed: Jennifer Myres Assignment 2 to Inheritance Advanced Comment Jennifer Myres Assignment 2 to Inheritance Advanced

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication of. Additional Info: Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF BEVERLY BERNELL MYRES Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF BEVERLY BERNELL MYRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketConfidential Statement of Birthdate & Drivers License signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities signed. Additional Info: Duties and Liabilities signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument filed:. Additional Info: Document filed: Jennifer Myers Assignment to Inheritance Advanced Comment Jennifer Myers Assignment to Inheritance Advanced

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Myres, Jennifer : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036423-HOJ Myres, Jennifer $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Myres, Jennifer : Transaction Assessment $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Myres, Jennifer; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice. Additional Info: Request for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice OF ASSIGNMENT Comment OF ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice OF ASSIGNMENT Comment OF ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate. Additional Info: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of. Additional Info: Petition for Letters of Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Comment Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less