This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/24/2022 at 15:37:48 (UTC).

ESTATE OF BENEDICT CHANG

Case Summary

On 08/25/2015 ESTATE OF BENEDICT CHANG was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A and GEORGE A. MIRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6031

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A

GEORGE A. MIRAM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAM, FELISA

Decedent

CHANG, BENEDICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAMAR, HILARY L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT ; FOR A Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT ; FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS; AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED Comment NADCR: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED

Conversion Action.

ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED; CLAIM IS $185.75. Comment AREJC: ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED; CLAIM IS $185.75.

Order for Final Distribution.

Order for Final Distribution AND SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR ALLOWING S Comment AND SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR, ALLOWING STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES

Conversion Action.

CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED BY HEARTY FARE IN THE AMOUNT OF $2446.88. Comment CREC: CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED BY HEARTY FARE IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,446.88.

Conversion Action.

CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED BY KK GRAPHICS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1305.00. Comment CREC: CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED BY KK GRAPHICS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,305.00.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED Comment NADCR: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order.

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Conversion Action.

ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED; CLAIM IS ALLOWED FOR $220.25. Comment AREJC: ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITOR`S CLAIM FILED; CLAIM IS ALLOWED FOR $220.25.

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order.

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE FBO Comment ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO, A CORPORATION SOLE FBO STAR OF THE SEA CHURCH

Receipt on Distribution signed by.

Receipt on Distribution signed by ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE FBO Comment ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO, A CORPORATION SOLE FBO PRIESTS' RETIREMENT FUND

Order for Final Distribution - Decedent's Estate.

Order for Final Distribution - Decedent's Estate AND SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF Comment AND SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR ALLOWING STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES

Petition for Final Distribution.

PRO Minute Order Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT ; FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS; AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

Amendment.

Amendment TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND RPEORT OF EXECUTOR PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT FOR ALLOWANCE O Comment TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND RPEORT OF EXECUTOR, PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of 1ST & FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR ETC. SEE SRV. LIST Comment 1ST & FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR ETC. SEE SRV. LIST

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT ; FOR A Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT ; FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS; AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

Petition for Final Distribution.

Petition for Final Distribution FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR PETITION FOR SETTLEM Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR, PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS, AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order.; Additional Info: Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketComment:.; Additional Info: Comment ORDER RETURNED FILED & MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketEx Parte sent to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Comment 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Submitted.; Additional Info: Comment FINAL DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE FBO Comment ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO, A CORPORATION SOLE FBO STAR OF THE SEA CHURCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution signed by.; Additional Info: Receipt on Distribution signed by ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE FBO Comment ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO, A CORPORATION SOLE FBO PRIESTS' RETIREMENT FUND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Order of Final Distribution; Comment; Comment: (AND SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR, ALLOWING STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Final Distribution - Decedent's Estate.; Additional Info: Order for Final Distribution - Decedent's Estate AND SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF Comment AND SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR ALLOWING STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketComment:.; Additional Info: Comment FILE RETURNED; ORDER SIGNED AND FILED IN COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution.; Additional Info: PRO Minute Order Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT ; FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS; AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2015
  • FinancialFinancial; CHANG, BENEDICT; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: DUTIES AND LIABILITIES SIGNED BY FELISA LAM. Comment DL: DUTIES AND LIABILITIES SIGNED BY FELISA LAM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION OF PROPOSED EXECUTOR REGARDING SEARCH FOR DECEDENT'S HEIRS-AT LAW Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF PROPOSED EXECUTOR REGARDING SEARCH FOR DECEDENT'S HEIRS-AT LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition.; Additional Info: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH ATA FILED BY FELISA LAM. Comment PPE: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH ATA FILED BY FELISA LAM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED. Comment NPAE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150825-0775-CK 210/ 30.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketCourt reporter fees.; Additional Info: Comment CRFEE1: COURT REPORTER FEE OF $30.00 PAID BY FELISA LAM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150825-0773-CK 196/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketPetition.; Additional Info: Comment PPF: PETITION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less