This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 16:46:18 (UTC).

Estate of ANTHONY FRENCH WILLARD

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Estate of ANTHONY FRENCH WILLARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A. and Miram, George A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1173

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A.

Miram, George A

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Not Yet Classified

WILLARD, CHRISTOPHER

Decedent

WILLARD, ANTHONY FRENCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

ZOHAR, GADI

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer.

Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Comment Estate

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Duties and Liabilities signed.

Duties and Liabilities signed

Petition for Letters of.

Petition for Letters of Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Comment Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative.

Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative with LIMITED authority Comment with LIMITED authority

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee.

Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee Probate Referee appointed: William T. Dunlap Comment Probate Referee appointed: William T. Dunlap

Order for Probate; Personal Representative.

Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Administrator with Limited Authority. Bond: Comment appointed as Administrator with Limited Authority. Bond: N/A. Deposits: N/A Expires: N/A

Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA.

Original Type Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA ~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA 11/06/2020 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: ZOHAR, GADI

Proof of Publication of.

Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF ANTHONY FRENCH WILLARD Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF ANTHONY FRENCH WILLARD

Waiver of Accounting.

Waiver of Accounting JUDITH WILLARD Comment JUDITH WILLARD

Waiver of Accounting.

Waiver of Accounting NANCY JACKSON Comment NANCY JACKSON

Waiver of Accounting.

Waiver of Accounting JAMES W. SULLIVAN Comment JAMES W. SULLIVAN

Waiver of Accounting.

Waiver of Accounting HELEN SULLIVAN Comment HELEN SULLIVAN

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary JUDITH WILLARD Comment JUDITH WILLARD

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary NANCY JACKSON Comment NANCY JACKSON

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary JAMES SULLIVAN Comment JAMES SULLIVAN

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary HELEN SULLIVAN Comment HELEN SULLIVAN

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLARD, CHRISTOPHER : Case Payment Receipt # 2020-043632-HOJ ZOHAR, GADI $81.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLARD, CHRISTOPHER : Transaction Assessment $81.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: WILLARD, CHRISTOPHER; Total Financial Assessment $81.00; Total Payments and Credits $81.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration issued to Personal Representative. Additional Info: Letters of Administration issued to Personal Representative with LIMITED authority Comment with LIMITED authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Appointment of CA Probate Referee. Additional Info: Request for Appointment of CA Probate Referee Probate Referee appointed: William T. Dunlap Comment Probate Referee appointed: William T. Dunlap

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate; Personal Representative. Additional Info: Order for Probate; Personal Representative appointed as Administrator with Limited Authority. Bond: Comment appointed as Administrator with Limited Authority. Bond: N/A. Deposits: N/A Expires: N/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration Hearing with ATA. Additional Info: Original Type Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA ~PRO Minute Order - Letters of Administration Hearing with ATA 11/06/2020 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: ZOHAR, GADIPersonal RepresentativeAttorney: ZOHAR, GADI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication of. Additional Info: Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF ANTHONY FRENCH WILLARD Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF ANTHONY FRENCH WILLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Accounting. Additional Info: Waiver of Accounting JUDITH WILLARD Comment JUDITH WILLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Accounting. Additional Info: Waiver of Accounting NANCY JACKSON Comment NANCY JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketConfidential Statement of Birthdate & Drivers License signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer. Additional Info: Proof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Comment Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLARD, CHRISTOPHER : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036388-HOJ WILLARD, CHRISTOPHER $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLARD, CHRISTOPHER : Transaction Assessment $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: WILLARD, CHRISTOPHER; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received ORDER FOR PROBATE Comment ORDER FOR PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate. Additional Info: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities signed. Additional Info: Duties and Liabilities signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of. Additional Info: Petition for Letters of Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Comment Administration & Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less