This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:53:06 (UTC).

ESPERANZA P FLORES vs. DARRYL A JORDAN, JR

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 ESPERANZA P FLORES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DARRYL A JORDAN, JR. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Greenberg, Susan, Franchi, Don R, Holt, Rachel E and Peterson, Stacy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7693

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Greenberg, Susan

Franchi, Don R

Holt, Rachel E

Peterson, Stacy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

FLORES, ESPERANZA P

FLORES, ESPERANZA P.

Defendant

JORDAN, DARRYL

Respondent

JORDAN, DARRYL A, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

 

Court Documents

DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer DCSS Family Law Support - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment FOR JUDGMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND OTHER: ONE-HALF OF UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND DENTAL EXPENSES Parties Present Petitioner: FLORES, ESPERANZA PRespondent: JORDAN, DARRYL A, JRSupplemental Plaintiff: COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment RE: CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, PROPERTY CONTROL, OTHER; OST, PAYMENT OF ETC Parties Present Petitioner: FLORES, ESPERANZA PRespondent: JORDAN, DARRYL A, JR

Request for Order RE: Child Custody and Visitation.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order RE: Child Custody and Visitation 08/16/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment and review of family court services report Parties Present Petitioner: FLORES, ESPERANZA P

Review.

*FAM Minute Order - Review 09/28/2017 Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Comment CONTINUED PER DCSS CALENDAR MEO Parties Present Petitioner: FLORES, ESPERANZA P

Request for Order RE: Child Custody and Visitation.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order RE: Child Custody and Visitation 11/01/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment and review of family court services report Parties Present Petitioner: FLORES, ESPERANZA P

Request for Default/Uncontested Judgment.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Default/Uncontested Judgment 08/10/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: FLORES, ESPERANZA P.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMail returned undelivered.; Additional Info: Comment Document: JUDGMENT Reason: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Judgment - Status Only; Party; Names; FLORES, ESPERANZA P; JORDAN, DARRYL A, JR; FLORES, ESPERANZA P.; JORDAN, DARRYL A, JR; FLORES, ESPERANZA P; COUNTY OF SAN MATEO; JORDAN, DARRYL; Comment; Comment: ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution Entered (Status Only).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketJudgment sent to Judicial Officer for signature.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketJudgment Received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal.; Additional Info: Comment Separation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketJudgment returned to party.; Additional Info: Comment Per Judicial Officer Instructions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment sent to Judicial Officer for signature.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketJudgment Received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION - LEGAL SEP. W/MINOR CHILD OF FLORES SERVED ON DARRYL A JORDAN JR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/15/15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Legal Separation with Minor Child File Date 01/06/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketFee Waiver Granted.; Additional Info: Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY ESPERANZA P FLORES GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 SIGNED BY PPEDRINI/DCII ON 01/06/15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ESPERANZA P FLORES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY ESPERANZA P FLORES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA.; Additional Info: Comment DUCCJ: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketPetition for Legal Separation -Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PLS: PETITION FOR LEGAL SEPARATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less