This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:19:44 (UTC).

EQUABLE ASCENT VS MICHAEL K. HAR

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 EQUABLE ASCENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL K HAR. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4896

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC

Defendants

MICHAEL K HAR

HAR, MICHAEL K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUREN, TARA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC AS TO MICHAEL K HAR, BY SUB-SERVING DONG DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/11/12.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: HAR MICHAEL K; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC AS TO MICHAEL K HAR, BY SUB-SERVING DONG DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/11/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0226-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280226 EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less