This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:19:36 (UTC).

EQUABLE ASCENT VS MANUELO B APELLANES

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 EQUABLE ASCENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANUELO B APELLANES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4895

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC

Defendants

MANUELO B APELLANES

APELLANES, MANUELO B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUREN, TARA

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (3) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,949.65, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JUDGMENT CCP 585 (D) FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC AS TO MANUELO B APELLANES BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/16/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Amended Request for Entry of Default.

FILING Comment ARD: AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO MANUELO B APELLANES FILED.

Conversion Action.

WRIT (15) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SANTA BARBARA COUNTY COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST 2015.5 FILED

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 05/03/2016 Amount: 2758.59 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 05/03/2016 Amount: 2758.59

Declaration.

DECLARATION (5) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION LOST CONTRACT ORIGINAL FILED

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (4) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,129.57, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT WAIVE DIFFERENCE CCP 585(D) FILED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC AS TO MANUELO B APELLANES.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 03/07/14 AS FOLLOWS:

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC; Awarded Against: APELLANES MANUELO B; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 03/07/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC FOR EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MANUELO B APELLANES PRINCIPAL IS $17,850.23. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $3,726.54. COSTS ARE $435.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $22,011.77.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Return. Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 05/03/2016 Amount: 2758.59 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 05/03/2016 Amount: 2758.59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT (15) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SANTA BARBARA COUNTY COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 160127-0444-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $25986.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS (3) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,949.65, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 151201-0709-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150831-0731-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC AS TO MANUELO B APELLANES BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/16/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0235-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280235 EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less