This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:13:21 (UTC).

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL VS JESUS RUVALCABA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESUS RUVALCABA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4902

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC

Defendants

JESUS RUVALCABA

RUVALCABA, JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUREN, TARA

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST (2) REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC AS TO JESUS RUVALCABA.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST (2) REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC AS TO JESUS RUVALCABA.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC SERVED ON JESUS RUVALCABA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/21/12.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: RUVALCABA JESUS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to enter default filed. Additional Info: REQUEST (2) REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC AS TO JESUS RUVALCABA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC SERVED ON JESUS RUVALCABA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/21/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0302-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270302 EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less