This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:56:45 (UTC).

ELIZABETH DABU AND ANASTACIO PIEDAD

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 ELIZABETH DABU AND ANASTACIO PIEDAD was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8643

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DABU, ELIZABETH M.

Respondent

PIEDAD, ANASTACIO B., JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCOTT, RYNE M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: PIEDAD ANASTACIO B., JR; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: DABU, ELIZABETH M.; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment MSE: MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 03/25/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Comment JNM: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED; MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 03/25/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal. Additional Info: Comment DDUD: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Request to enter default filed. Additional Info: Comment RDDEF: (FL) REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF DABU AS TO ANASTACIO B. PIEDAD JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment DRSDD: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY/FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ELIZABETH M. DABU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Income & Expense Declaration. Additional Info: Comment IE: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ELIZABETH M. DABU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF DABU SERVED ON ANASTACIO B. PIEDAD JR. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/17/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JFDE: JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DOCUMENT EXAMINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment JR: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY ELIZABETH M. DABU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Declaration for Assignment to North Branch filed.. Additional Info: Comment DANB: DECLARATION FOR ASSIGNMENT TO NORTH BRANCH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Case assigned to Department for all purposes. Additional Info: Comment APJ15: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120806-0525-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for DABU, ELIZABETH M. : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060525 DABU, ELIZABETH M. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for DABU, ELIZABETH M. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: DABU, ELIZABETH M.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less