This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/07/2022 at 12:31:21 (UTC).

ELISA EISEMAN AND PHILIPPE BISHOP

Case Summary

On 06/24/2015 ELISA EISEMAN AND PHILIPPE BISHOP was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hill, Elizabeth M, SUSAN GREENBERG, Holt, Rachel E, Private, Greenberg, Susan, DUBOIS, HILL, Franchi, Don R and SWOPE PARTY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9572

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hill, Elizabeth M

SUSAN GREENBERG

Holt, Rachel E

Private

Greenberg, Susan

DUBOIS

HILL

Franchi, Don R

SWOPE PARTY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EISEMAN, ELISA

Respondent

BISHOP, PHILIPPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER F

 

Court Documents

Conference.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment Conference Call

Motion hearings.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Dept: 3 HEARING: (FL) MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY; VISITATION BY PHILIPPE BISHOP Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LAUGHLIN, AMYRespondentAttorney: EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER F

Request for Order RE: Child Custody and Visitation.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: EISEMAN, ELISAAttorney: LAUGHLIN, AMYRespondent: BISHOP, PHILIPPEAttorney: EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER F

Request for Order.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment RE: OTHER: FOR PETITIONER TO MAKE REASONABLE EFFORTS TO SEEK WORK Parties Present Petitioner: EISEMAN, ELISAAttorney: LAUGHLIN, AMYRespondent: BISHOP, PHILIPPEAttorney: EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER F

Conference.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LAUGHLIN, AMYRespondentAttorney: EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER F

Other hearing.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment MINOR INTERVIEW

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND OTHER: FOR RESPONDENT TO MAKE REASONABLE EFFORTS TO SEEK WORK, REPORT HIS EFFORTS TO SEEK WORK, SUBMIT TO A FOCUSED EMPLOYMENT EVALUATION AND ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Parties Present Petitioner: EISEMAN, ELISAAttorney: LAUGHLIN, AMYRespondent: BISHOP, PHILIPPEAttorney: EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER F

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment OTHER: 1. ADVANCE OF COMMUNITY PROPERTY FUNDS 2. ALLOCATION OF HEALTH INSURANCE PREMIUM COSTS Parties Present Petitioner: EISEMAN, ELISAAttorney: LAUGHLIN, AMYRespondent: BISHOP, PHILIPPEAttorney: EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER F

Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment Dept 3 recuses self-now in Dept 12 Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LAUGHLIN, AMYRespondentAttorney: EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER FAttorney: O'FLAHERTY, ABBY

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order 08/18/2017 Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment OTHER: REQUIRE BOTH PARTIES AND THEIR MINOR CHILDREN TO ENGAGE IN INTENSIVE REUNIFICATION SERVICES Parties Present Petitioner: EISEMAN, ELISAAttorney: LAUGHLIN, AMYRespondent: BISHOP, PHILIPPEAttorney: EMLEY, CHRISTOPHER F

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for EISEMAN, ELISA; Case Payment Receipt # 2020-012524-HOJ EISEMAN, ELISA $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for EISEMAN, ELISA; Transaction Assessment $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re.; Additional Info: Comment NOTICE OF HEARING AND STATUS CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for BISHOP, PHILIPPE; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-049199-HOJ BISHOP, PHILIPPE $28.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for BISHOP, PHILIPPE; Transaction Assessment $28.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketPleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued.; Additional Info: Comment (JOINDER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan and Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order.; Additional Info: Comment JUDGE PRO TEM PAUL J WALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for BISHOP, PHILIPPE; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-047978-HOJ BISHOP, PHILIPPE $29.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
410 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for EISEMAN, ELISA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • FinancialFinancial; EISEMAN, ELISA; Total Financial Assessment $910.00; Total Payments and Credits $850.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution with Minor Child File Date 06/24/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA.; Additional Info: Comment DUCCJ: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY ELISA EISEMAN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 23 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150624-0333-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EMLEY, CHRISTOPHE FIELDING