This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 11:03:51 (UTC).

ELIJAH BROWN, ETAL VS MILLS-PENINSULA, ETAL

Case Summary

On 11/20/2015 ELIJAH BROWN, ETAL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MILLS-PENINSULA, ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Karesh, Jonathan E, Davis, III, Leland, Grandsaert, John L, Greenberg, Susan, Fineman, Nancy L, Scott, Joseph C, Novak, Lisa A, ROBERT D. FOILES, ETEZADI, FOILES, KARESH, GREENBERG and DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6321

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Karesh, Jonathan E

Davis, III, Leland

Grandsaert, John L

Greenberg, Susan

Fineman, Nancy L

Scott, Joseph C

Novak, Lisa A

ROBERT D. FOILES

ETEZADI

FOILES

KARESH

GREENBERG

DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEIPE, AMANDA

Defendants

MILLS-PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES

SUTTER HEALTH

VIRTUAL RADIOLOGICAL CORPORATION

MEDNAX, INC

VIRTUAL RADIOLOGICAL PROFESSIONALS OF CALIFORNIA, P.A.

MILLS-PENINSULA MEDICAL CENTER

DURISETI, RAM S

LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AT STANFORD

CHANG, SCOTT C

VIRTUAL RADIOLOGICAL PROFESSIONALS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FAGEL, BRUCE G

ASCENCIO, EDUARDO J

Defendant Attorneys

SHEUERMAN, DAVID

GARVIN, MICHAEL J.

HILLEARY, ANNE S.

LAW, YUK L

DONNELLY, THOMAS J.

LUCCHESE, DAVID R

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received DETERMINING FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT Comment DETERMINING FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Order Approving Compromise Claim/Action.

Order Approving Compromise Claim/Action Signed By: JUDGE KARESHDate Signed: 7-30-19 Comment Signed By: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 7-30-19

Notice.

Notice Notice of Continuance Comment Notice of Continuance

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF BRUCE G FAGEL ESQ., OF PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR'S COMPROMISE Comment OF BRUCE G FAGEL, ESQ., OF PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Motion for Protective Order.

~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Protective Order 07/23/2019 Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CUMULATIVE DEFENSE EXPERTS; AND FOR ORDER EXCLUDING DR AMENT, PLAINTIFF'S FORMER EXPERT WHO HAS NOW BEEN RETAINED BY THE DEFENSE

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order GRANTING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION Comment GRANTING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received AMENDED APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR Comment AMENDED APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR

Petition for Compromise.

~CIV Minute Order - Petition for Compromise 05/23/2019 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment OF PENDING ACTION FOR MINOR Parties Present DefendantAttorney: LAW, YUK LDefendantAttorney: LAW, YUK LDefendantAttorney: LAW, YUK LDefendantAttorney: LAW, YUK LDefendantAttorney: LAW, YUK L

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re NOTICE OF HEARING OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF A MINOR'S CLAIM Comment NOTICE OF HEARING OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF A MINOR'S CLAIM

Exhibit List Receipt.

Exhibit List Receipt Received by Exhibit Technician. Plaintiff's and Defendant's Exhibit List Comment Received by Exhibit Technician. Plaintiff's and Defendant's Exhibit List

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) AS TO DEFENDANT MILLS-PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICE Comment AS TO DEFENDANT, MILLS-PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, ONLY

Order Approving Compromise Claim/Action.

Order Approving Compromise Claim/Action

Notice.

Notice OF FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE PAGE OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE Comment OF FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE PAGE OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE

Compromise of Minor(s) Claims.

~CIV Minute Order - Compromise of Minor(s) Claims 01/13/2020 Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment CourtCall approved for Plaintiff's Attorney Parties Present DefendantAttorney: GARVIN, MICHAEL J.Plaintiff: GEIPE, AMANDA

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim Comment Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition.

Petition Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Comment Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

623 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List Receipt.; Additional Info: Exhibit List Receipt Received by Exhibit Technician. Plaintiff's and Defendant's Exhibit List Comment Received by Exhibit Technician. Plaintiff's and Defendant's Exhibit List

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; VIRTUAL RADIOLOGICAL PROFESSIONALS OF CALIFORNIA, P.A.; MILLS-PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES; SUTTER HEALTH; VIRTUAL RADIOLOGICAL CORPORATION; MEDNAX, INC; CHANG, SCOTT C; DURISETI, RAM S; GEIPE, AMANDA; VIRTUAL RADIOLOGICAL PROFESSIONALS, LLC; LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AT STANFORD; Mills-Peninsula Health Services; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name; MILLS-PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES; Comment: AS TO DEFENDANT MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) AS TO DEFENDANT MILLS-PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICE Comment AS TO DEFENDANT, MILLS-PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise Claim/Action.; Additional Info: Order Approving Compromise Claim/Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE PAGE OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE Comment OF FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE PAGE OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMotion granted..; Additional Info: Comment Moving party: Plaintiff's Motion title: Minor's Compromise

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
661 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 11/20/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: APP/ORDER FOR GAL RECEIVED AND FWD TO JUDGE SCOTT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ELIJAH BROWN. Comment N: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ELIJAH BROWN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 151120-0315-CK 209/ 150.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketAdvance Jury Fees Non-Refundable.; Additional Info: Comment AJFEE: ADVANCE JURY FEE POSTED BY PLNTF ON BEHALF OF ELIJAH BROWN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 151120-0312-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Virtual Radiologic Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Mednax Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Mills-Peninsula Health Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford is a litigant