This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/25/2022 at 13:44:13 (UTC).

ELI COLE THOMAS AND ANTOINETTE THOMAS

Case Summary

On 01/02/2015 ELI COLE THOMAS AND ANTOINETTE THOMAS was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANCHI, Franchi, Don R, Holt, Rachel E, Jakubowski, Susan and Warner, Loreen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7674

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

FRANCHI

Franchi, Don R

Holt, Rachel E

Jakubowski, Susan

Warner, Loreen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THOMAS, ELI COLE

Respondent

THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTAL

Not Classified By Court

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

 

Court Documents

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION AND OTHER: SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED SEPTEMBER 13, 2016, AND JUDGMENT, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 473 Parties Present Petitioner: THOMAS, ELI COLEAttorney: UY, ROBERTRespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTALAttorney: DUMONT, PAUL P.

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment TEMPORARY EMERGENCY ORDERS (DENIED) RE: C/C; VISITATION; C/S; REQUEST TO CLAIM CHILDREN AS DEPENDENTS FOR BAH & VETERANS DISABILITY BENEFITS, SUPERVISED VISITATION; Per Family Court Services, request to continue hearing for completion of report (3 weeks out). Parties Present Petitioner: THOMAS, ELI COLEAttorney: UY, ROBERTRespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTALAttorney: DUMONT, PAUL P.

Request for Order RE: Child Custody and Visitation.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment and review of the family court services report Parties Present Petitioner: THOMAS, ELI COLEAttorney: UY, ROBERTRespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTALAttorney: DUMONT, PAUL P.

Request for Order RE: Child Support.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: THOMAS, ELI COLEAttorney: UY, ROBERTRespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTAL

Family Law Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: UY, ROBERTRespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTAL

Request for Order RE: Modification.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order RE: Modification 07/14/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment VISITATION, SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT AND ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Parties Present Petitioner: THOMAS, ELI COLEAttorney: UY, ROBERTRespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTAL

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/28/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: THOMAS, ELI COLEAttorney: UY, ROBERTRespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTAL

Review.

*FAM Minute Order - Review 06/06/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment child custody Per phone call from petitioner; request to continue hearing to 6/6/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mr. Uy shall give notice. Parties Present Petitioner: THOMAS, ELI COLEAttorney: UY, ROBERTRespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents.; Additional Info: Comment Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketMinutes and Order or Judgment.; Additional Info: Comment ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketStipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge.; Additional Info: Comment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketDCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment CHILD SUPPORT/HEALTH CARE/ONE-HALF OF UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL AND DENTAL EXPENSES Parties Present Petitioner: THOMAS, ELI COLERespondent: THOMAS, ANTOINETTE QUINTAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketProof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents.; Additional Info: Comment Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for COUNTY OF SAN MATEO; Government Exemption $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for COUNTY OF SAN MATEO; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; COUNTY OF SAN MATEO; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for THOMAS, ELI COLE; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • FinancialFinancial; THOMAS, ELI COLE; Total Financial Assessment $700.00; Total Payments and Credits $700.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Legal Separation with Minor Child File Date 01/02/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY ELI COLE THOMAS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA.; Additional Info: Comment DUCCJ: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150102-0347-CC 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketPetition for Legal Separation -Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PLS: PETITION FOR LEGAL SEPARATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less