This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:15:06 (UTC).

ELGAR GUTIERREZ V. MIGUEL AYALA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 ELGAR GUTIERREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIGUEL AYALA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6647

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELGAR GUTIERREZ

San Mateo, CA 94403

GUTIERREZ, ELGAR

Defendants

MIGUEL AYALA

AYALA, MIGUEL

 

Court Documents

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSC1: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF GUTIERREZ SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL AS TO MIGUEL AYALA ON 07/02/12; HEARING DATE 08/20/12. SIGNED FOR BY SIGNATURE ILLEGIBLE.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: AYALA MIGUEL; Comment: 0001 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM; Party; Name: GUTIERREZ, ELGAR; Comment: 0001 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: HEARING NOTICE Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: SCC SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSC1: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF GUTIERREZ SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL AS TO MIGUEL AYALA ON 07/02/12; HEARING DATE 08/20/12. SIGNED FOR BY SIGNATURE ILLEGIBLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CM: CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ACRC: AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $10000.00. REASON FOR CLAIM: AUTO ACCIDENT 112211

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0884-CK 005/ 75.00 007/ 10.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Comment PCF3: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for GUTIERREZ, ELGAR : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260884 GUTIERREZ, ELGAR $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for GUTIERREZ, ELGAR : Transaction Assessment $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: GUTIERREZ, ELGAR; Total Financial Assessment $85.00; Total Payments and Credits $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less