This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 02:02:12 (UTC).

Elavon, Inc. vs. Dang Song, et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Elavon, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dang Song. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3359

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elavon, Inc.

Defendants

Song, Dang

GPSA VACATION

DOES 1 - 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAZIANO, JOSEPH P

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND STATEMENT OF VENUE CIVIL CODE SECTION 2984.4

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default. Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND STATEMENT OF VENUE CIVIL CODE SECTION 2984.4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.. Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Elavon, Inc. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-024551-HOJ Elavon, Inc. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Elavon, Inc. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Elavon, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue. Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Elavon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAZIANO JOSEPH PETER