This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 20:20:45 (UTC).

EDWARD RODIACK vs. KRISTINE RODIACK

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 EDWARD RODIACK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KRISTINE RODIACK. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holt, Rachel E. and Holt, Rachel E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1690

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holt, Rachel E.

Holt, Rachel E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODIACK, EDWARD

Respondent

RODIACK, KRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SAMUELS, CHRISTIANA E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Status Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Comment 10/15/2020 ELECTRONICALLY FILED RESPONSE AND 10/15/2020 ELECTRONICALLY FILED ADR served on JOE DELLA SANTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for RODIACK, KRISTINE : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-040455-HOJ RODIACK, KRISTINE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for RODIACK, KRISTINE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: RODIACK, KRISTINE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketResponse & Request for. Additional Info: Comment Dissolution (Divorce) of Marriage/Domestic Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for RODIACK, EDWARD : Case Payment Receipt # 2020-036219-HOJ RODIACK, EDWARD $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for RODIACK, EDWARD : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: RODIACK, EDWARD; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less