This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 19:09:34 (UTC).

EDWARD MITCHELL VS DOROTHY CAMPBELL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2012 EDWARD MITCHELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOROTHY CAMPBELL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L and ROBERT D. FOILES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4589

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L

ROBERT D. FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL, EDWARD

Defendant

CAMPBELL, DOROTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEDER, JOHN M.

Defendant Attorney

DANFORTH, LEE J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ORDER Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 12/05/12

Conversion Action.

NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (2) Comment NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDWARD MITCHELL.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (2) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOROTHY CAMPBELL.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDWARD MITCHELL. Comment NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDWARD MITCHELL.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 12/05/12 Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 12/05/12

Conversion Action.

PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOROTHY CAMPBELL. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOROTHY CAMPBELL.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EDWARD MITCHELL. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EDWARD MITCHELL.

Answer (Unlimited).

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF MITCHELL FILED BY DOROTHY CAMPBELL REPRESENTED BY LEE J. DANFORTH Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF MITCHELL FILED BY DOROTHY CAMPBELL, REPRESENTED BY LEE J. DANFORTH

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MITCHELL SERVED ON DOROTHY CAMPBELL WITH SE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MITCHELL SERVED ON DOROTHY CAMPBELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketSettlement Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 01:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; CAMPBELL, DOROTHY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; MITCHELL, EDWARD; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDWARD MITCHELL. Comment NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDWARD MITCHELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment ADRMEO: MEDIATION WITH CHARLIE HAWKINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 12/05/12 Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 12/05/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: STIP & ORDER TO ADR RECEIVED AND SENT TO DEPT 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MITCHELL SERVED ON DOROTHY CAMPBELL WITH SE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MITCHELL SERVED ON DOROTHY CAMPBELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MITCHELL, EDWARD; Case Payment Receipt # 201206250649 MITCHELL, EDWARD $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MITCHELL, EDWARD; Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; MITCHELL, EDWARD; Total Financial Assessment $545.00; Total Payments and Credits $545.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/13/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120625-0649-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

JOHN M. FEDER, ESQ. (SBN 83391)

ROUDA, FEDER, TIETJEN & McGUINN 7

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 4000 gflg&%@ San Francisco, California 94104

Telephone: 415-398-5398

Facsimile: 415-398-8169 JUN 1.3 2012

Attorneys for Plaintiff

SUPERICR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN MATEO (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

EDWARD MITCHELL, ) CASENO, Giv 514589 Plaintiff, ) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ) vs. ) ) (Personal Injury-Vehicle Related) DOROTHY CAMPBELL, and ) - DOES 1-25, inclusive, ) Jury Trial Demanded

FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION

Negligence 1. Plaintiff is unaware of the true names and capacities of those defendants

sued herein as DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and therefore sues said defendants by such fictitious names. Plaintiff will amend this Complaint to allege the true names and capacities of said defendants, when the same have been ascertained, together with such other charging allegations as may be abpropriate. Plaintiff is informed and believes and accordingly alleges that each of such fictitiously-named defendants is legally responsible

in some manner for the occurrence, injuries, and damages hereinafter alleged.

in some manner for the occurrence, injuries, and damages hereinafter alleged. 2. At all times herein mentioned, defendants DOROTHY CAMPBELL and Does 1 through 25, inclusive, and each of them, were and are the owners of a 1997 Infiniti 130, California License Platé No. 3UCZ337.

2. At all times herein mentioned, defendants DOROTHY CAMPBELL and Does 1 through 25, inclusive, and each of them, were and are the owners of a 1997 Infiniti 130, California License Platé No. 3UCZ337.

3. On or about June 28, 2010, at approximately 3:20 pm defendant DOROTHY CAMPBELL, and DOES 1 through 25, were driving and operating the aforementioned 1997 Inifiniti 130; California License Plate No. 3UCZ337 southbound on St. James Road.

4: On or about June 28, 2010, at approximately 3:20 p.m., plaintiff EDWARD MITCHELL was riding his bicycle northbound on St. James Road in Belmont, California, when he was struck by the 1997 Inifinti 130 vehicle heading southbound on St. James Road, operated by defendant DOROTHY CAMPBELL, and DOES 1 through 25. At said time and place, defendant, DOROTHY CAMPBELL, and DOES 1-25, attempted to turn left onto Heritage Court and struck plaintiff, causing plaintiff to sustain severe injuries. Defendants, and each of them, so negligentiy and carelessly drove, owned, entrusted, maintained, and operated the aforementioned vehicle so as to proximately cause the collision with plaintiff EDWARD MITCHELL, and causing him severe injuries.

5. Plaintiff is informed and believes that defendant DOROTHY CAMPBELL, and DOES 1-25 were negligently inattentive while driving the 1997 Infiniti 130 vehicle by failing to pay attention to the traffic conditions, bicyclists and her surroundings immediately prior to impact, and made an unsafe left turn directly in front of EDWARD MITCHELL, a violation of Vehicle Code section 22107. Moreover, defendant DOROTHY CAMPBELL, and DOES 1-25proper care while operating the vehicle, and violated Mr. Mitchell’s right of way.

6. Venue is proper in the County of San Mateo because the defendant resides

in Belmont, California.

in Belmont, California. 7. As a proximate result of the carelessness and negligence of defendants, and each of them, plaintiff EDWARD MITCHELL sustained severe injuries, all of which have caused and continue to cause plaintiff extreme physical and mental pain and shffering, all to plaintiffs general damages in an amount exceeding the jurisdictional minimum of this Court.

7. As a proximate result of the carelessness and negligence of defendants, and each of them, plaintiff EDWARD MITCHELL sustained severe injuries, all of which have caused and continue to cause plaintiff extreme physical and mental pain and shffering, all to plaintiffs general damages in an amount exceeding the jurisdictional minimum of this Court.

8. As a further proximate result of the carelessness and negligence of defendants, and each of them, plaintiff has incurred and continues to incur medical and other incidental expenses for the treatment of the personal injuries alleged hereinabove, to plaintiffs damages in an amount to be determined according to proof.

9. As a further proximate result of the carelessness and negligence of defendants, and each of them, plaintiff EDWARD MITCHELL has sustained a loss of earnings and earning capacity, to his damage in an amount to be determined according to proof.

10. As a further direct and proximate result of the carelessness, negligent and unlawful conduct of defendants, and each of them, plaintiff has sustained property damage to his bicycle in an amount to be determined according to proof.

WHEREFORE, plaintiff prays judgment against defendants, and each of them, as

follows: 1. For general damages-according to proof; | 2. For medical and related expen‘ses according to proof; 3. For loss of earnings and earning capacity; 4, For property damages and other economic losses according to proof; d. For prejudgment interest:; 6. For costs of suit herein incurred; and

follows: 1. For general damages-according to proof; | 2. For medical and related expen‘ses according to proof; 3. For loss of earnings and earning capacity; 4, For property damages and other economic losses according to proof; d. For prejudgment interest:; 6. For costs of suit herein incurred; and 2| DATED: 3

2| DATED: 3

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEDER, JOHN M.