This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 19:29:20 (UTC).

EDUARDO MENDOZA,ETAL VS JEFFRY E. WENCESLAO,ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2012 EDUARDO MENDOZA,ETAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEFFRY E WENCESLAO,ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Dylina, Steven L., Grandsaert, John L and STEVEN L. DYLINA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4659

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Dylina, Steven L.

Grandsaert, John L

STEVEN L. DYLINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MENDOZA, EDUARDO

MENDOZA, DENISE

Defendants

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

WENCESLAO, JEFFRY ELLA

SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT ("SAM TRANS")

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUGART, JONATHAN M

Defendant Attorney

SERVERIAN, MICHAEL C

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Ex Parte.

APPLICATION Comment EPA: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY EDUARDO MENDOZA DENISE MENDOZA

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MENDOZA AS TO SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT BY SUB-SERVING JERRY DEAL, AGENT. MAILING DATE OF 06/22/12.

Stipulation filed.

STIPULATION Comment STI: (S) STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment REQDD: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT OF MENDOZA AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN MATEO WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (3) Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MENDOZA SERVED ON JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/04/12.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER (2) Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF MENDOZA FILED BY JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL C SERVERIAN

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF MENDOZA FILED BY SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL C SERVERIAN

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO, SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDUARDO MENDOZA DENISE MENDOZA Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDUARDO MENDOZA, DENISE MENDOZA

Conversion Action.

PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Notice.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY EDUARDO MENDOZA DENISE MENDOZA. Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY EDUARDO MENDOZA, DENISE MENDOZA.

Order.

ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 05/02/13, FILED. Comment O: ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 05/02/13, FILED.

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLIC.AND DOC SERVED ON JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANS Comment POS: PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLIC.AND DOC SERVED ON JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO, SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT BY FAX WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 04/26/13.

Stipulation filed.

(S) STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED Comment STI: (S) STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF D.ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY EDUARDO Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF D.ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY EDUARDO MENDOZA DENISE MENDOZA

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO, SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT ("SAM TRANS"); Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; WENCESLAO, JEFFRY ELLA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; MENDOZA, DENISE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; MENDOZA, EDUARDO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketSettlement Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 01:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 53 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Statement.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDUARDO MENDOZA DENISE MENDOZA Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY EDUARDO MENDOZA, DENISE MENDOZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment *620*: HMSC CALENDARED ON 07/11/13 IN DEPT. 7. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 07/11/13 IN DEPT. 53.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.; Additional Info: Comment MSS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RECEIVED FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MENDOZA AS TO JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO BY Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MENDOZA AS TO JEFFRY ELLA WENCESLAO, BY SUB-SERVING DAVID TRIOTO, CHIEF SAFETY/RISK MANAGEMENT. MAILING DATE OF 06/26/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MENDOZA, EDUARDO; Case Payment Receipt # 201206260085 MENDOZA, EDUARDO $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MENDOZA, EDUARDO; Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; MENDOZA, EDUARDO; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/15/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0085-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Mendoza, et al. v. San Mateo County Transit Districf. etal. Page—4-- .San Mateo County Superior Court No. CIV 514659

Answer to Complaint by Defendant San Mateo County Transit District, Cont'd

SIXTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

Plaintiffs’ complaint is barred by their failure to comply with the claims provisions of

California Government Code §900, et seq.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Mateo County Transit District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUGART JONATHAN M