This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/03/2022 at 23:14:33 (UTC).

EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE vs. CRYSTAL GEYSER WATER COMPANY, et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against CRYSTAL GEYSER WATER COMPANY,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Karesh, Jonathan E, SET, SWOPE, Swope, V. Raymond, Davis, III, Leland and HAYWOOD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1213

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Karesh, Jonathan E

SET

SWOPE

Swope, V. Raymond

Davis, III, Leland

HAYWOOD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE

Defendants

PEPSICO, INC.

DANONE NORTH AMERICA

CRYSTAL GEYSER WATER COMPANY

COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE.

MARS, INCORPORATED

NESTLE USA, INC

THE PROCTER & GAMBER COMPANY

THE CLOROX COMPANY

MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC.

THE COCA-COLA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COTCHETT, JOSEPH W.

REDENBARGER, TYSON

MOLUMPHY, MARK C.

Defendant Attorneys

TULUMELLO, ANDREW SANTO

LOOSE, TIMOTHY WILLIAM

GIGOUNAS, GEORGE L

BINGHAM, ALLEXANDERIA V

PIERRE TATRO, RENE

MARKOWITZ, JULIET ARLENE

GOETZ, RICHARD BLAIR

SESTITO, DAWN

RABER, STEPHEN DAVID

JURA, PERLETTE MICHELE

BOUTROUS, THEODORE J.

ALEXANDER, MARY ROSE

TOUGH, MARGARET

LANKENAU, SHANNON DANIELLE

GOODMAN, MARK C.

ASSAYAG, ANNE KELTS

LAFAYETTE, GARY T

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

2021-10-22 POS.pdf Comment REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMP Comment SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; ETC... served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF NOORJAHAN TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FURT Comment OF NOORJAHAN TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing the September 20 2021 Comment Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing the September 20, 2021 Motion to Quash and Setting Revised Briefing Schedule served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: Stipulation and Order Continuing the September 20 2021 Motion to Quash an Comment Type: Stipulation and Order Continuing the September 20, 2021 Motion to Quash and Setting Revised Briefing Schedule Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 8/17/21

Application.

Application OF DEFENDANTS FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF DEADLINES UNTIL JUNE 4 2021 CONFERENCE, LEAVE FOR A Comment OF DEFENDANTS FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF DEADLINES UNTIL JUNE 4, 2021 CONFERENCE, LEAVE FOR ADDITONAL PAGINATION, AND EXTENSION FOR JOINT DEMURRER

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S R Comment PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY Comment TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY STAY

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDA Comment PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK F PERSONAL JURISDICTION;ETC... served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO Comment GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received DENYING SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS Comment DENYING SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF MARK C. MOLUMPHY OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE;ETC... Comment OF MARK C. MOLUMPHY OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE;ETC...

Request for Judicial Notice.

Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO Q Comment IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Declaration in Opposition.

Declaration in Opposition OF DAVID MCGUIRE TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMON Comment OF DAVID MCGUIRE TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Declaration in Opposition.

Declaration in Opposition OF DIANNA COHEN TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS Comment OF DIANNA COHEN TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUAS Comment TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

168 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMotion to Quash.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 3:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 3:00 PM Comment SET BY JUDGE W/MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDA Comment PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK F PERSONAL JURISDICTION;ETC... served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO Comment GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received DENYING SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS Comment DENYING SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support.; Additional Info: Declaration in Support OF MARK C. MOLUMPHY OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE;ETC... Comment OF MARK C. MOLUMPHY OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE;ETC...

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice.; Additional Info: Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO Q Comment IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Opposition.; Additional Info: Declaration in Opposition OF DAVID MCGUIRE TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMON Comment OF DAVID MCGUIRE TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Opposition.; Additional Info: Declaration in Opposition OF DIANNA COHEN TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS Comment OF DIANNA COHEN TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.; Additional Info: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUAS Comment TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE; Total Financial Assessment $1,715.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,715.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Complex Case Status Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Re: Complex Case Designation.; Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less