This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 11:00:05 (UTC).

DUNG NGUYENETAL VS JEREMY JUNG

Case Summary

On 11/06/2012 DUNG NGUYENETAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEREMY JUNG. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7863

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUNG NGUYEN

HUONG TRAN

AN NGUYEN

NGUYEN, AN

TRAN, HUONG

NGUYEN, DUNG

Defendants

JEREMY JUNG

JUNG, JEREMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIN, ANDREW B.

Defendant Attorney

ZYMAN, STELLA H

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment DNE: DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED. REASON: ENTIRE ACTION WAS DISMISSED ON 6/26/13.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

General Denial filed.

DENIAL Comment GD: (S) GENERAL DENIAL TO THE COMPLAINT OF NGUYEN FILED BY JEREMY JUNG REPRESENTED BY STELLA H ZYMAN

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF NGUYEN SERVED ON JEREMY JUNG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/12/12.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: JUNG JEREMY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: NGUYEN, AN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: TRAN, HUONG; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: NGUYEN, DUNG; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: REQUEST Comment DNE: DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED. REASON: ENTIRE ACTION WAS DISMISSED ON 6/26/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121219-0684-CK 173/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • First Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP: FIRST PAPER FEE PAID BY JEREMY JUNG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • General Denial filed. Additional Info: DENIAL Comment GD: (S) GENERAL DENIAL TO THE COMPLAINT OF NGUYEN FILED BY JEREMY JUNG REPRESENTED BY STELLA H ZYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF NGUYEN SERVED ON JEREMY JUNG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/12/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 11/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121107-0506-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Financial info for JUNG, JEREMY : Case Payment Receipt # 201212190684 JUNG, JEREMY $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Financial info for JUNG, JEREMY : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Financial: JUNG, JEREMY; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • Financial info for NGUYEN, DUNG : Case Payment Receipt # 201211070506 NGUYEN, DUNG $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • Financial info for NGUYEN, DUNG : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • Financial: NGUYEN, DUNG; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE: Nguyen v. Jung CASE NUMBER"

4. [_] Plaintiff (name): is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

and has complied with the fictitious business name laws. 5. Each defendant named above is a natural person a. [__] except defendant (name): (1) =] a business organization, form unknown (2) [Z_] a corporation

¢. [_] except defendant (name): (1) ] a business organization, form unknown (2) ] a corporation

(3) (1 an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [__] a public entity (describe):

(5) [__] other (specify):

b. [ ] except defendant (name):

(1) (] a business organization, form unknown (2) [_] a corporation

(3) ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) (] a public entity (describe):

(5) [_] other (specify):

d. [ ] except defendant (name):

(1) ] a business organization, form unknown (2) ] a corporation

(3) (] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__1 an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) [ a public entity (describe): (4) [] a public entity (describe):

(5) [__1 other (specify): (5) (] other (specify):

[_] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 5.

6. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

a. [/ ] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1-20 were the agents or employees of other named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

b. [ /] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1-20 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

7. [_] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

8. This court is the proper court because a. [__] atleast one defendant now resides in its jurisdictional area. b. [—_] the principal place of business of a defendant corporation or unincorporated association is in its jurisdictional area. C. [Il injury to person or damage to personal property occurred in its jurisdictional area.

d. ] other (specify):

9. [] Piaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [_] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [] is excused from complying because (specify):

PLD-PI-001 [Rev. January 1, 2007]

PLD-PI-001 [Rev. January 1, 2007] PLD-Pi-001

PLD-Pi-001

SHORT TITLE: Nguyen v. Jung CASE NUMBER:

The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached):

. [ Motor Vehicle

. [/ General Negligence

. [_] Intentional Tort

. ] Products Liabitity

. [ Premises Liability

. [_] Other (specify):

O QaooTon

Plaintiff has suffered

a. [/ ] wage loss

b. (/] loss of use of property

. /] hospital and medical expenses

/] general damage

. [/ property damage

[Z] loss of earning capacity

[] other damage (specify): pre-judgement interest and other incidental expenses

@ ~0 a0

[ The damages claimed for wrongful death and the relationships of plaintiff to the deceased are a. [_] listed in Attachment 12. b. [_] as follows:

The relief sought in this complaint is within the jurisdiction of this court.

Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. (1) [/] compensatory damages (2) (] punitive damages The amount of damages is (in cases for personal injury or wrongful death, you must check (1)): (1) £ according to proof (2) [ inthe amount of: $

LZ] A’Efi paragraphs of this complaint alleged on information and belief are as follqws (specify paragraph numbers):

Date: 11/01/12

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNASIRE ORPLAKAIFF QA ATTORKEY)