Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 22:51:55 (UTC).

DRR, INC. VS ED CORNET

Case Summary

On 02/22/2008 DRR, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ED CORNET. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0488

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DRR, INC.

ADCOM WORLDWIDE

Defendants

CORNET, ED

CORNET, SHERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOONEY, MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2008
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: DRR INC.; Awarded Against: CORNET, ED; CORNET, SHERRY; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/04/08 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF DRR, INC. FOR DRR, INC. DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ED CORNET, SHERRY CORNET PRINCIPAL IS $2,831.28. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $301.84. COSTS ARE $355.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,488.12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $3488.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $355.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $301.84.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $2831.28.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ED CORNET SHERRY CORNET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF DRR INC. FOR DRR, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Judgment by Clerk. Additional Info: Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/04/08 AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DAI: DECLARATION FOR ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $301.84 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2008
  • Default Received.. Additional Info: Comment DR: DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/22/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 080225-0077-CK 030/ 180.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • Financial info for DRR, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 200802250077 DRR, INC. $180.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • Financial info for DRR, INC. : Transaction Assessment $180.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • Financial: DRR, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $180.00; Total Payments and Credits $180.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOONEY, MICHAEL A.