This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 05:04:34 (UTC).

Drake Law Firm vs. Wilbur Esquivel Castillo, et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Drake Law Firm filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wilbur Esquivel Castillo. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Weiner, Marie S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3700

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Weiner, Marie S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Drake Law Firm

Defendants

California Emergency Physicians Medical Group

Vibrant Care Rehabilitation

Esquivel Castillo, Wilbur

American Medical Response

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

St. Rose Hospital

Peninsula Medical Center

Vatche Cabayan Medical Corporation

California Advanced Imaging Medical Association

Statewide Interpreters

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAKE, BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default Not Entered.

Request for Entry of Default Not Entered DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED PROOF OF SERVICE IS QUEST Comment DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED, PROOF OF SERVICE IS QUESTIONABLE. SUBSTITUTED SERVICE WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 09/03/2020 NO MAILING DATE LISTED. ALSO PLEASE CORRECT THE NAME OF THE DEFENDANT UNDER #1 (C) ON THE DEFAULT APPLICATION SHOULD MATCH ON THE COMPLAINT.

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default.

Request for Entry of Default (Vibrant)+.pdf

Request to Enter Default.

Request for Entry of Default (Peninsula)+.pdf

Request for Entry of Default Not Entered.

Request for Entry of Default (Cabayan)+.pdf Comment DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED PROOF OF SERVICE IS QUESTIONABLE. SUBSTITUTED SERVICE WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 09/03/2020 NO MAILING DATE LISTED. ALSO PLEASE CORRECT THE NAME OF THE DEFENDANT UNDER #1 (C) ON THE DEFAULT APPLICATION SHOULD MATCH ON THE COMPLAINT.

Request to Enter Default.

Request for Entry of Default (AMR)+.pdf

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 12/15/2021 at 9:00a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 12/15/2021 at 9:00a.m.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default Not Entered.

Request for Entry of Default Not Entered PARTY NOT MATCHING ON COMPLAINT Comment PARTY NOT MATCHING ON COMPLAINT

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Not Entered.; Additional Info: Request for Entry of Default Not Entered PARTY NOT MATCHING ON COMPLAINT Comment PARTY NOT MATCHING ON COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Comment CMC 1/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Drake Law Firm; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-034072-HOJ Drake Law Firm $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Drake Law Firm; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Drake Law Firm; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peninsula Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Vatche Cabayan Medical Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where DRAKE LAW FIRM is a litigant