This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:15:52 (UTC).

DORIS DE LEON AND APOLINARIO DE LEON, JR

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 DORIS DE LEON AND APOLINARIO DE LEON, JR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Greenberg, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8188

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Greenberg, Susan

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DE LEON, DORIS T

TIAMZON, DOLORES G

Respondent

DE LEON, APOLINARIO M, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: DE LEON APOLINARIO M, JR; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: DE LEON, DORIS T; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED FROM 32 TO 23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • Substitution of Attorney as to. Additional Info: Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY ROBERT UY REMOVED AS TO DORIS T DE LEON AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Comment DDUJ: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment MSE: MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 01/18/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Comment JNM: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED; MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 01/18/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • Findings and Order After Hearing. Additional Info: Comment FOAHI: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING 121012 FILED BY DORRIS DELEON, SIGNED BY S GREENBERG, ON 12/13/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JFDE: JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DOCUMENT EXAMINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment DRSDD: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DORIS T DE LEON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment DRSDD: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DORIS T DE LEON.

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment PDEC: (FL) PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY DORIS T DE LEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY DORIS T DE LEON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Financial info for DE LEON, DORIS T : Case Payment Receipt # 201211090392 DE LEON, DORIS T $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Financial info for DE LEON, DORIS T : Case Payment Receipt # 201211090128 DE LEON, DORIS T $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Financial info for DE LEON, DORIS T : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Financial info for DE LEON, DORIS T : Case Payment Receipt # 201211090124 DE LEON, DORIS T $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Financial info for DE LEON, DORIS T : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Financial: DE LEON, DORIS T; Total Financial Assessment $90.00; Total Payments and Credits $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less