This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:48:09 (UTC).

DONALD RINK VS. UNITED AIRLINES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 DONALD RINK filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against UNITED AIRLINES, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Karesh, Jonathan E, DuBois, Richard H, Karesh, Jonathan E. and DuBois, Richard H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8980

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Karesh, Jonathan E

DuBois, Richard H

Karesh, Jonathan E.

DuBois, Richard H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DONALD RINK

RINK, DONALD

Defendants

UNITED AIRLINES, INC.

STEVE LEWIS

KOSH HARRINANUTH

PAUL RIZZO

RAKESH ROSHAN

LEWIS, STEVE

ROSHAN, RAKESH

HARRINANUTH, KOSH

RIZZO, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYLAND, JOHN F.

Defendant Attorney

GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDEL

 

Court Documents

Order After Hearing.

Order After Hearing Hearing Type: RUKIN HYLAND DORIA & TINDALL MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Sign Comment Hearing Type: RUKIN HYLAND DORIA & TINDALL MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Signed by: JUDGE DUBOIS Date Signed: 02/02/17

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order EXTENDING TIME FOR PLANTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC. SIGNED BY JUDG Comment EXTENDING TIME FOR PLANTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 01/04/17

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of DOCUMENTS SERVED: NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; DELCARATIO Comment DOCUMENTS SERVED: NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; DELCARATION ETC

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Comment RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE FOILES ON 1 Comment GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE FOILES ON 11/03/16

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SIGNED BY MICHELE HAYDEL GEHRLA Comment SIGNED BY MICHELE HAYDEL GEHRLA

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RESPONSIVE... Comment EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RESPONSIVE...

Notice of Hearing.

Notice of Hearing Notice of CMC 11/4/16 Comment Notice of CMC 11/4/16

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Comment GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved.

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Comment as Counsel

Motion.

Motion TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Comment TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved.

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Comment as Counsel

Motion.

Motion TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Comment TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;COMPLAINT.... Comment SUMMONS;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;COMPLAINT....

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SIGNED BY MICHELE HAYDEL GEHRKE Comment SIGNED BY MICHELE HAYDEL GEHRKE

Ex Parte.

Ex Parte APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONTINUE CMC;MPA;DE Comment APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONTINUE CMC;MPA;DECL....

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2017
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present Plaintiff: RINK, DONALDDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDELDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDELDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDELDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDELDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present DefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDELDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDELDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDELDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDELDefendantAttorney: GEHRKE, MICHELE HAYDEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND PROOF OF SE Comment PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order After Hearing. Additional Info: Order After Hearing Hearing Type: RUKIN HYLAND DORIA & TINDALL MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Sign Comment Hearing Type: RUKIN HYLAND DORIA & TINDALL MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Signed by: JUDGE DUBOIS Date Signed: 02/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to be Relieved as Counsel. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer DuBois Richard H. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order After Hearing. Additional Info: Order After Hearing Hearing Type: DENYING JOHN F HYLAND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Signed by: Comment Hearing Type: DENYING JOHN F HYLAND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Signed by: KARESH Date Signed: 01/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of STIP FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME ETC. Comment STIP FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: Stipulation & Order EXTENDING TIME FOR PLANTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC. SIGNED BY JUDG Comment EXTENDING TIME FOR PLANTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 01/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-069413-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-061157-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Case Payment Receipt # 201606060692 RINK, DONALD $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial info for RINK, DONALD : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial: RINK, DONALD; Total Financial Assessment $655.00; Total Payments and Credits $655.00

    Read MoreRead Less