This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 08:02:44 (UTC).

DONALD MOFFITT vs. XPO LOGISTICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/17/2016 DONALD MOFFITT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against XPO LOGISTICS, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1943

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOFFITT, DONALD

Defendant

XPO LOGISTICS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIMMER, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

MAECHTLEN, LAURA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of See 2. Comment See 2.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court TO FEDERAL COURT Comment TO FEDERAL COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Stay/Removal; Comment; Comment; (CASE REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court. Additional Info: Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court TO FEDERAL COURT Comment TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of See 2. Comment See 2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for XPO LOGISTICS, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-059558-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for XPO LOGISTICS, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial: XPO LOGISTICS, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Financial info for MOFFITT, DONALD : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-051761-HOJ MOFFITT, DONALD $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Financial info for MOFFITT, DONALD : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Financial: MOFFITT, DONALD; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XPO Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAECHTLEN LAURA JEAN