This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:57:45 (UTC).

DONALD L CRAIGHEAD V XUEQIN XIAO

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 DONALD L CRAIGHEAD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against XUEQIN XIAO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McKenna, Kathleen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6867

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

McKenna, Kathleen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DONALD L CRAIGHEAD

Millbrae, CA 94030

CRAIGHEAD, DONALD L

Defendants

XUEQIN XIAO

XIAO, XUEQIN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim.

CLAIM Comment PCF3: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT BACK TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR BY ASSIGNEE FILED.

Assignment of Judgment.

FILING Comment AJ: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO FRANK KAUL FILED

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

APPLICATION (2) Comment APJD2: (SC) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR XUEQIN XIAO FILED BY FRANK KAUL

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSR: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF CRAIGHEAD SERVED BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO XUEQIN XIAO ON 08/06/12 COSTS $65.00, HEARING DATE 09/24/12.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

APPLICATION Comment APJD2: (SC) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR XUEQIN XIAO FILED BY FRANK KAUL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CRAIGHEAD DONALD L; Awarded Against: XIAO, XUEQIN; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 11/15/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF CRAIGHEAD FOR DONALD L CRAIGHEAD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF CRAIGHEAD AGAINST XUEQIN XIAO DEFENDANT(S) XUEQIN XIAO SHALL PAY PLAINTIFF(S) DONALD L CRAIGHEAD $9,900.00 PRINCIPAL AND $140.00 COSTS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/15/12 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES 11/15/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (2) Comment FILED: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT BACK TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR BY ASSIGNEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment REMPTY: REMOVE PARTY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF CRAIGHEAD =2 FRANK KAUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: NO PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment HEARING: APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR XUEQIN XIAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Judgment Debtor - Appearance. Additional Info: Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: SCH HEARING: APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR XUEQIN XIAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: NO PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment HEARING: APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR XUEQIN XIAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Judgment Debtor - Appearance. Additional Info: Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: SCH HEARING: APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR XUEQIN XIAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 131004-0295-CK 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2012
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Original Type Small Claims Hearing Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Conversion Continuance Comment Dept: SCC SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSR: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF CRAIGHEAD SERVED BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO XUEQIN XIAO ON 08/06/12 COSTS $65.00, HEARING DATE 09/24/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ACRC: AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $10000.00. REASON FOR CLAIM: RENT, PLUS IMPROVEMENTS REQUESTED BY TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120806-0563-CK 005/ 75.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: CLAIM Comment PCF3: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for CRAIGHEAD, DONALD L : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060563 CRAIGHEAD, DONALD L $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for CRAIGHEAD, DONALD L : Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: CRAIGHEAD, DONALD L; Total Financial Assessment $75.00; Total Payments and Credits $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less