This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 14:54:45 (UTC).

DONALD GORRELL, et al vs. BAY PACIFIC PIPELINE, INCORPORATED, et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 DONALD GORRELL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BAY PACIFIC PIPELINE, INCORPORATED. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L., Chou, Danny Y., Chou, Danny Y and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1535

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L.

Chou, Danny Y.

Chou, Danny Y

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GORRELL, PAMELA

GORRELL, DONALD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BAY PACIFIC PIPELINE, INCORPORATED

DOES 1 through 30, inclusive

CITY OF BELMONT

Cross Defendants

MOES 1 THROUGH 30, INCLUSIVE

MOES 1 - 30, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINDSOR, JEFFREY R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BLAISDELL, BENJAMIN W.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMC 10/14/20 Comment CMC 10/14/20

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) ANSWER Comment ANSWER

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

Case Management Statement.

CMC.Stmt.2021.02.25.OL.pdf

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CASE MANAGEME Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER served on TERRI COOK CITY CLERK

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMC 12/10/20 Comment CMC 12/10/20

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: GORRELL DONALD; GORRELL, PAMELA; BAY PACIFIC PIPELINE, INCORPORATED; CITY OF BELMONT; DOES 1 through 30, inclusive; MOES 1 THROUGH 30, INCLUSIVE; MOES 1 - 30, INCLUSIVE; Comment: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOSC Needs to be set Failure to file Stip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CITY OF BELMONT : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-002375-HOJ CITY OF BELMONT $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc.. Additional Info: Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT - EUGENE CAREW - AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT - EUGENE CAREW - AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for GORRELL, DONALD : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-014299-HOJ Gorrell, Donald $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for GORRELL, DONALD : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: GORRELL, DONALD; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAY PACIFIC PIPELINE, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINDSOR, JEFFREY R.