This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 05:22:50 (UTC).

DJIBRILL DIALLO RASHID vs. BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2016 DJIBRILL DIALLO RASHID filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0854

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RASHID, DJIBRILL DIALLO

Defendants

BOARDWALK AUTO MALL

BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC.

DOES 1-20

DOES 2-20, inclusive

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANGLIN, KIM L

Defendant Attorney

BLUTE, JONATHAN M.

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal AS TO ALL CLAIMS EXCEPT 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION With Prejudice Comment AS TO ALL CLAIMS EXCEPT 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION, With Prejudice

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Type: Conditional Comment Type: Conditional

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: ANGLIN, KIM LDefendantAttorney: BLUTE, JONATHAN M.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Comment OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ETC. Comment ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, ETC.

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT JAMIE KOPF - AGENT FOR SERVICE Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT JAMIE KOPF - AGENT FOR SERVICE

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal AS TO 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION Without Prejudice Comment AS TO 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION, Without Prejudice

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Notice.

Notice OF POSTING JURY FEES Comment OF POSTING JURY FEES

Notice.

Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Comment OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited FOR DAMAGES Comment FOR DAMAGES

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (AS TO 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 06/26/17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (AS TO ALL CLAIMS EXCEPT 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 06/26/17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal AS TO ALL CLAIMS EXCEPT 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION With Prejudice Comment AS TO ALL CLAIMS EXCEPT 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION, With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal AS TO 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION Without Prejudice Comment AS TO 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION, Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment JURY TRIAL. ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Type: Conditional Comment Type: Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Motion granted.. Additional Info: Comment Moving party: Defendant Boardwalk Auto Center Motion title: Request for authorized representative of the insurer of Defendant Boardwalk Auto Center

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-046579-HOJ BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial: BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for RASHID, DJIBRILL DIALLO : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-059570-HOJ JANEY AND JANEY $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for RASHID, DJIBRILL DIALLO : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for RASHID, DJIBRILL DIALLO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for RASHID, DJIBRILL DIALLO : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-034981-HOJ RASHID, DJIBRILL DIALLO $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for RASHID, DJIBRILL DIALLO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial: RASHID, DJIBRILL DIALLO; Total Financial Assessment $1,020.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less