This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:17:51 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS VIRGIL FONSECA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VIRGIL FONSECA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V Raymond and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4863

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V Raymond

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

Defendants

VIRGIL FONSECA

FONSECA, VIRGIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSTERMAN, PETER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD AS TO VIRGIL FONSECA BY SUB-SERVING JOHN "DOE" (CO-RESIDENT). MAILING DATE OF 07/18/12.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE (2) Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

Motion.

NOTICE Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS ETC FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Conversion Action.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSQS: PROOF OF SERVICE (QUESTIONABLE SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD AS TO VIRGIL FONSECA FILED. SERVICE QUESTIONABLE BECAUSE NO DECLARATION DUE DILIGENCE AND PROOF OF MAILING.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD FILED BY VIRGIL FONSECA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: FONSECA VIRGIL; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: PROPOSED ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED TRUTH OF FACTS FORWARDED TO DEPT 23 FOR APPROVAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY S.HARRIS ON 02/26/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: TENTATIVE RULING IS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: * *.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: ATTORNEY YALON IS PRESENT TO ADVISE THE COURT THAT A NOTICE OF STETTLEMENT HAS BEEN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYNP: VIRGIL FONSECA NOT PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2012
  • Financial info for FONSECA, VIRGIL : Case Payment Receipt # 201207200269 FONSECA, VIRGIL $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Financial info for FONSECA, VIRGIL : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Financial: FONSECA, VIRGIL; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Financial info for DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD : Case Payment Receipt # 201301310558 DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Financial info for DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Financial info for DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD : Case Payment Receipt # 201301180530 DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Financial info for DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260694 DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD; Total Financial Assessment $315.00; Total Payments and Credits $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less