This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 15:16:42 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Hilda Herceg, et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hilda Herceg. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3188

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendants

Herceg, Hilda

Daly City, CA 94015-4413

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMANN, MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS, LYNDA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer (Limited up to $10000).

Answer (Limited up to $10000) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN DOE CO-RESIDENT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN DOE CO-RESIDENT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CMC Comment AND CMC

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for DOES 1 TO 10 : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-027280-HOJ DOES 1 TO 10 $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: DOES 1 TO 10; Total Financial Assessment $0.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Herceg, Hilda : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Herceg, Hilda; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Limited up to $10000). Additional Info: Answer (Limited up to $10000) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN DOE CO-RESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN DOE CO-RESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Discover Bank : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023262-HOJ Discover Bank $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Discover Bank : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CMC Comment AND CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS, LYNDA