Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:42:09 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. ALTHEA D LEJARDE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALTHEA D LEJARDE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Novak, Lisa A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2792

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Novak, Lisa A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LEJARDE, ALTHEA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HANDCOCK, KELSEY

HANDCOCK, KELSEY R.

 

Court Documents

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033.

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Declaration.

Declaration RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS Comment RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS

Statement.

Statement OF CASE Comment OF CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order.

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

Complaint.

Complaint

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ETC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment.

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Comment pursuant to CCP 585

Judgment.

Judgment BY COURT Comment BY COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Novak Lisa A.; Judgment Type; Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: LEJARDE, ALTHEA D; Amount; Damages: $2,591.23; Costs: $290.00; Total: $2881.23; Party; Names: DISCOVER BANK; LEJARDE, ALTHEA D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Judgment BY COURT Comment BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Declaration RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS Comment RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Comment pursuant to CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033. Additional Info: Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement. Additional Info: Statement OF CASE Comment OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SENT TO DEPARTMENT 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default. Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ETC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for DISCOVER BANK : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037356-HOJ HANDCOCK, KELSEY $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for DISCOVER BANK : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: DISCOVER BANK; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less