This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/11/2022 at 07:14:19 (UTC).

DIANNA CORDY, et al vs. CHURCH OF THE HIGHLANDS, et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 DIANNA CORDY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHURCH OF THE HIGHLANDS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4714

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORDY, DIANNA

CORDY, JOHN

CORDY, KAITLYN

Defendants

CHURCH OF THE HIGHLANDS

HIGHLANDS CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS

BATNAG, FIDEL, JR

MIRANDA, DALTON

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COWAN, JOHN E

Defendant Attorney

MINIOZA, JOSEPH J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN CO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLEX CASES ONLY)

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN CO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLEX CASES ONLY)

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN CO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLEX CASES ONLY) SERVED TO: FIDEL BATNAG, PRINCIPAL AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN CO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLEX CASES ONLY) SERVED TO: FIDEL BATNAG, PRINCIPAL AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO DEPT. 4 APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUAR Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Comment DEPT. 4 APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO DEPT. 34 STIP/ADR Judicial Officer Halperin, Ernst A. Comment DEPT. 34, STIP/ADR

CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip.

CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docket1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 09/30/22 as mediation set for 09/01/22 - courtesy extension per stip/o to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip.; Additional Info: CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CORDY, DIANNA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-051964-HOJ CORDY, DIANNA $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Fee Paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CORDY, DIANNA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-036166-HOJ CORDY, DIANNA $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CORDY, DIANNA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; CORDY, DIANNA; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINIOZA, JOSEPH J.