This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:13:58 (UTC).

DEVIN DUFFY, ET AL VS JOSE ALVARO

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 DEVIN DUFFY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ALVARO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Novak, Lisa A, Dylina, Steven L. and Novak, Lisa A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4915

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Novak, Lisa A

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEVIN DUFFY

MICHELLE CHRISTINE PELLONE

DUFFY, DEVIN

PELLONE, MICHELLE CHRISTINE

Defendants

JOSE ALVARO

ALVARO, JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERLINI, P TERRY

Defendant Attorney

SAGER, GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: JURY FEES FILED.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (3) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEVIN DUFFY MICHELLE CHRISTINE PELLONE.

Conversion Minute.

NOTICES PRINTED FOR SSLL /GS ON 1/08/13 Comment *NOT: NOTICES PRINTED FOR SSLL /GS ON 1/08/13

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (2) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOSE ALVARO.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF DUFFY SERVED ON JOSE ALVARO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/30/12.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ORDER Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 03/14/13

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DUFFY FILED BY JOSE ALVARO REPRESENTED BY GREGORY SAGER

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEVIN DUFFY MICHELLE CHRISTINE PELLONE.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (4) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOSE ALVARO.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: ALVARO JOSE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PELLONE, MICHELLE CHRISTINE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: DUFFY, DEVIN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ADRMED: MEDIATION WITH BERNARD T COTTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: ORDER Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 03/14/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: STIP & ORDER TO ADR RECEIVED AND SENT TO DEPT 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Comment ADRSTP: PRINT ADR STIPULATION DUE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0378-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Financial info for ALVARO, JOSE : Case Payment Receipt # 201211010421 ALVARO, JOSE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Financial info for ALVARO, JOSE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Financial: ALVARO, JOSE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for DUFFY, DEVIN : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280378 DUFFY, DEVIN $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for DUFFY, DEVIN : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: DUFFY, DEVIN; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less