Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 07:57:54 (UTC).

DENNIS THOMAS VS AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2012 DENNIS THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etezadi, Susan I, Dylina, Steven L, Grandsaert, John L, Novak, Lisa A, Lee, Elizabeth K, Grandsaert, John L., Lee, Elizabeth K., Dylina, Steven L., Novak, Lisa A., Etezadi, Susan I., GRANDSAERT, ETEZADI, LEE, NOVAK, LISA A. NOVAK, ELIZABETH K. LEE, STEVEN L. DYLINA, SUSAN I. ETEZADI and JOHN L. GRANDSAERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8382

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etezadi, Susan I

Dylina, Steven L

Grandsaert, John L

Novak, Lisa A

Lee, Elizabeth K

Grandsaert, John L.

Lee, Elizabeth K.

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

Etezadi, Susan I.

Not Yet Classifieds

GRANDSAERT

ETEZADI

LEE

NOVAK

LISA A. NOVAK

ELIZABETH K. LEE

STEVEN L. DYLINA

SUSAN I. ETEZADI

JOHN L. GRANDSAERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DENNIS THOMAS

CAMILLE THOMAS

THOMAS, DENNIS

THOMAS, CAMILLE

THE DENNIS AND CAMILLE THOMAS FAMILY TRUST

THE DENNIS AND CAMILLE TOMAS FAMILY TRUST

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC

WILLIAM DEDOMENICO

ERNEST J ONGARO

DEBRA LYNN ONGARO

DEAN M ONGARO

CINDY T ONGARO

MITCHELL A ONGARO

ELIZABETH A ONGARO

AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DEDOMENICO, WILLIAM

ONGARO, CINDY T

ONGARO, MITCHELL A

ONGARO, ELIZABETH A

ONGARO, DEAN M

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DEDOMENICO, WILLIAM

THOMAS, DENNIS

THOMAS, CAMILLE

THE DENNIS AND CAMILLE THOMAS FAMILY TRUST

THE DENNIS AND CAMILLE TOMAS FAMILY TRUST

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

STACEY, SHERMAN L

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ, JONATHAN T

O'NEILL, DENNIS

MASON, TERREL J.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

O'NEILL, DENNIS

STACEY, SHERMAN L

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal ENTIRE CROSS-COMPLAINT With Prejudice Comment ENTIRE CROSS-COMPLAINT With Prejudice

Conversion Action.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF IS Comment SS: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS THOMAS CAMILLE THOMAS TR. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS THOMAS, CAMILLE THOMAS TR.

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/24/14 AS FOLLOWS: Comment JEAS: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/24/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Order.

ORDER MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SIGNED BY JUDGE NOVAK ON 06/06/14 FILED. Comment O2: ORDER MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, SIGNED BY JUDGE NOVAK ON 06/06/14 FILED.

Request for Judicial Notice.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY ERNEST J Comment RJN: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY ERNEST J ONGARO DEBRA LYNN ONGARO, DEAN M ONGARO, CINDY T ONGARO, MITCHELL A ONGARO, ELIZABETH A ONGARO.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS THOMAS CAMILLE THOMAS TR. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS THOMAS, CAMILLE THOMAS TR.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF THOMAS AS TO DEAN M ONGARO BY SUB-SERVI Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF THOMAS AS TO DEAN M ONGARO, BY SUB-SERVING AMY ONGARO - CO OCCUPANT. MAILING DATE OF 06/12/13.

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Opposition.

OPPOSITION TO PLTFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED BY AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APA Comment OPP: OPPOSITION TO PLTFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED BY AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC FILED BY DENNIS THOMAS, CAM Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC FILED BY DENNIS THOMAS, CAMILLE THOMAS TR , REPRESENTED BY SHERMAN L STACEY

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED. Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE FILED BY AIMCO ESP Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE FILED BY AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC.

Amended.

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY WILLIAM DEDOMENICO. Comment AMEN: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY WILLIAM DEDOMENICO.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE SERVED ON SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST Comment POES: PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE, SERVED ON SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY SHERMAN L STACEY FILED Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY SHERMAN L STACEY FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF THOMAS SERVED ON MITCHELL A ONGARO WITH SER Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF THOMAS SERVED ON MITCHELL A ONGARO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/08/13.

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketConversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial. Additional Info: CIV Minutes Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CROSS COMPLAINT OF ONGARO DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 7-21-16).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF ONGARO Comment WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF ONGARO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketConversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketSettlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mandatory Settlement Conferences - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AIMCO ESPLANADE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC DISMISSED.).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ONGAROWithout Prejudice Comment CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ONGARO Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal ENTIRE CROSS-COMPLAINTWith Prejudice Comment ENTIRE CROSS-COMPLAINT With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/01/16 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT PJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
655 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201212070033 Payor $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • FinancialFinancial: Payor; Total Financial Assessment $3,955.00; Total Payments and Credits $3,955.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121207-0033-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketFirst Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP: FIRST PAPER FEE PAID BY DENNIS THOMAS CAMILLE THOMAS TR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STACEY SHERMAN L.