This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 15:56:07 (UTC).

DEBRA GORDON vs MICHAEL DONECHO

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 DEBRA GORDON filed an Other lawsuit against MICHAEL DONECHO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, Grandsaert, John L, Davis, III, Leland, GRANDSAERT, GREENBERG, WEINER and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4834

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Grandsaert, John L

Davis, III, Leland

GRANDSAERT

GREENBERG

WEINER

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GORDON, BING

GORDON, DEBRA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MICHAEL FELLMAN SIDING AND ROOFING

IVARY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

FELLMAN, MICHAEL JOHN

DONECHO, MICHAEL JAMES

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

DONECHO CONSTRUCTION

OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.

RENAISSANCE STONE CARE & WATERPROOFING

FIRST, LAST & ALWAYS, INC.

ROES 1 TO 20

TRIMBLE ARCHITECTURE

SH BUILDERS

ROYALITE MANUFACTURING, INC.

ALPINE AIRE

MOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

FLATLINE FLOORS

SOLID CONCRETE SERVICE, INC.

WOODSIDE ELECTRIC, INC.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DONECHO, MICHAEL JAMES

DONECHO CONSTRUCTION

OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.

FIRST, LAST & ALWAYS, INC.

TRIMBLE ARCHITECTURE

ROYALITE MANUFACTURING, INC.

73 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RALLS, JOHN W

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CLINTON, DAVID A

BILIR, TIMUR

CHONG, NORMAN L.

BORBELY, THOMAS E

HALVERSON, JOEL L.

SULLIVAN, JESSE M.

NASTICH, SUMMER L.

LEVY, DAVID M.

KIDD, G NOEL

Other Attorneys

COVERT, KASEY A

LONG, JOSEPH A

SCHELEY, L. THEODORE

VORNHOLT, BRADLEY J.

CILLUFFO, DAWNA J

REINHOLTZ, JACK R

O'BRIEN, JILLISA L

MILLER, KATHLEEN C

SMIGLIANI, PAUL W, ESQ

RODMAN, JORDAN A., ESQ

23 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Answer.

Answer OF MICHAEL JAMES DONECHO dba DONECHO CONSTRUCTION TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SAN JOSE INSULATION Comment OF MICHAEL JAMES DONECHO, dba DONECHO CONSTRUCTION TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SAN JOSE INSULATION CONTRACTORS dba CENTRAL CALIFORNIA INSULATION

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS, CROSS-COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, ADR PACKET, SERV Comment SUMMONS, CROSS-COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, ADR PACKET, SERVED ON DAVID R. DUGGINS - PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 4/18 Comment CMC 4/18

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Comment With Prejudice as to S.R. FREEMAN. INC CROSS-COMPLAINT filed on 06/05/3019 ONLY

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Comment With Prejudice as to CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by HARDMAN GLAZING SYSTEMS INC. on 2/27/2019

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

672 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; DONECHO, MICHAEL JAMES; S.R. FREEMAN, INC.; MOES 1 THROUGH 50; GORDON, DEBRA; GORDON, BING; OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.; FELLMAN, MICHAEL JOHN; FIRST, LAST & ALWAYS, INC.; IVARY MANAGEMENT COMPANY; DOES 1 THROUGH 25; MICHAEL FELLMAN SIDING & ROOFING; TRIMBLE ARCHITECTURE; ROES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE; ALPINE AIRE; CREATIVE PLUMBING DESIGNS, INC.; MICHAEL FELLMAN SIDING AND ROOFING; HARDMAN GLAZING SYSTEMS, INC.; KLEIN PLASTERING; MORRISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.; NORTHSTAR WOODWORKS, INC.; ROYALITE MANUFACTURING, INC.; SAN JOSE INSULATION CONTRACTORS; S H BUILDERS; SOLID CONCRETE SERVICE, INC.; WILSON HYDRONICS; WOODSIDE ELECTRIC, INC.; ROES 1 THROUGH 25; MOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE; ZOES 1 THROUGH 25; POES 1 ATHROUGH 100; MOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE; SAM TRIMBLE DESIGN, INC.; ROES 2- 25; COES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE; KLEIN PLASTERING; ALPINE AIRE; CREATIVE PLUMBING DESIGNES, INC; MICHAEL FELLMAN SIDING AND ROOFING; FIRST,LAST & ALWAYS, INC; IVARY MANAGMENT COMPANY; MORRISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC; NORTHSTAR WOODWORKS, INC; OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC; ROYALITE MANUFACTURING,INC; SAN JOSE INSULATION CONTRACTORS; WOODSIDE ELECTRIC INC; SAM TRIMBLE DESIGNINC; TIPPING STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS; MASTER SHEET METAL LLC; ROES 5 THROUGH 25; BACKEN & GILLAM ARCHITECTS; ZOES 1 - 100, INCLUSIVE; ZOES 1 THROUGH 50; MASTER SHEET METAL LLC; ALLEN DRYWALL INC; Allen Drywall, Inc.(incorrectly sued as Allen Drywall & Assoc.); ALLEN DRYWALL; MASTER SHEET METAL LLC; MAR, TIPPING; MICHAEL FELLMAN SIDING; FIRST LAST ALWAYS; NORTHSTAR; MOES 1-100; BACKEN & GILLIAM; Michael James Donecho dba DONECHO CONSTRUCTION; OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.; OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.; OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.; OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.; MASTER SHEET METAL LLC; OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.; OMNISTONE MASONRY, INC.; WOODSIDE ELECTRIC, INC.; MORRISON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.; WILSON HYDRONICS; CREATIVE PLUMBING DESIGNS, INC.; Comment: Dismissal as to S. F. FREEMAN, INC. CROSS-COMPLAINT filed on 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Comment With Prejudice as to S.R. FREEMAN. INC CROSS-COMPLAINT filed on 06/05/3019 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Comment With Prejudice as to CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by HARDMAN GLAZING SYSTEMS INC. on 2/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
723 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..; Additional Info: Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, NOTICE OF CMC, SERVED ON JESSICA ANDOLIN, OFFICE MANAGER, AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for GORDON, DEBRA; Case Payment Receipt # 2018-059962-HOJ ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for GORDON, DEBRA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • FinancialFinancial; GORDON, DEBRA; Total Financial Assessment $1,475.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,475.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST, LAST & ALWAYS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ivary Management Company dba Renaissance Stone Care & Waterproofing is a litigant

Latest cases where Renaissance Stone Care & Waterproofing is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COVERT,ESQ, KASEY A.