This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/18/2022 at 05:38:49 (UTC).

DAVORIN KUCHAN, et al vs. DISTILLED RESOURCES, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 DAVORIN KUCHAN, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DISTILLED RESOURCES, INC ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A, CHOU and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0605

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

CHOU

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KUCHAN, DAVORIN

KUCHAN, LUCY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE COUNTESS WALEWSKA, LLC

GREAT WOMEN SPIRITS

DISTILLED RESOURCES, INC.

DOES 1 TO 25

Cross Defendants and Defendants

DISTILLED RESOURCES, INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

Intervenors

Great American Insurance Company

OLD WORLD SPIRITS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCMAHON, TIMOTHY D

CORSIGLIA, BRADLEY M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CERIO, GARY A.

LIVINGSTON, RENE WELZE

BROGHAMMER, JOHN D

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

LIVINGSTON, RENE WELZE

Defendant and Intervenor Attorney

BROGHAMMER, JOHN D

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF JOHN D. BROGHAMMER TO STIPULATION TO ALLOW GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPAN Comment OF JOHN D. BROGHAMMER TO STIPULATION TO ALLOW GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

Complaint in Intervention.

Complaint in Intervention

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order AND ORDER ALLOWING GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAI Comment AND ORDER ALLOWING GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO DEPT 34 AMENDED STIP/ORD TO ADR Judicial Officer Halperin, Ernst A.

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: TO ALLOW GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENESigned by: JUDGE CH Comment Type: TO ALLOW GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 11/4/2021

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF JOHN D. BROGHAMMER TO STIPULATION TO ALLOW GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPAN Comment OF JOHN D. BROGHAMMER TO STIPULATION TO ALLOW GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice as to Defendant THE COUNTESS WAL Comment With Prejudice as to Defendant THE COUNTESS WALEWSKA dba GREAT WOMEN SPIRITS ONLY on Complaint in Intervention filed 11/17/2021

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice AS TO DEFENDANT THE COUNTLESS WA Comment With Prejudice AS TO DEFENDANT THE COUNTLESS WALEWSKA DBA GREAT WOMEN SPIRITS ONLY

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order.

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order.

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

Order.

Order Type: TRIAL SETTING ORDER COPY SENT TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEYSigned by: JUDGE CHOUDate Signed: Comment Type: TRIAL SETTING ORDER COPY SENT TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 7/29/2022

PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET.

Proposed Order Cover Sheet

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference

Order.

Order Type: DETERMINING SETTLEMENTS TO BE IN GOOD FAITH PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS Comment Type: DETERMINING SETTLEMENTS TO BE IN GOOD FAITH PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 877 AND 877.6 (Orders) Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 7/27/22

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2023
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment 12-day est.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2023
  • DocketPretrial hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer(s) Weiner Marie S., Foiles, Robert D, Swope, V. Raymond, Mandatory Settlement Conferences, - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Attorney.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name; THE COUNTESS WALEWSKA, LLC; Comment: Dismissal as to Defendant THE COUNTESS WALWSKA dba GREAT WOMEN SPIRITS ONLY on Complaint in Intervention filed 11/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice as to Defendant THE COUNTESS WAL Comment With Prejudice as to Defendant THE COUNTESS WALEWSKA dba GREAT WOMEN SPIRITS ONLY on Complaint in Intervention filed 11/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name; THE COUNTESS WALEWSKA, LLC; Comment: AS TO DEFENDANT THE COUNTLESS WALEWSKA DBA GREAT WOMEN SPIRITS ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice AS TO DEFENDANT THE COUNTLESS WA Comment With Prejudice AS TO DEFENDANT THE COUNTLESS WALEWSKA DBA GREAT WOMEN SPIRITS ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment/Order.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment/Order.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; SCR Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; SCREEN SHOT OF COURT'S DOCKET RE CMC HEARING SET FOR June 9 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for KUCHAN, DAVORIN; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-005148-HOJ KUCHAN, DAVORIN $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for KUCHAN, DAVORIN; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; KUCHAN, DAVORIN; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Broghammer